EP1738454 - INVERTER BRIDGE CONTROLLER IMPLEMENTING SHORT-CIRCUIT PROTECTION SCHEME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMC Electrical Products, Inc. 6072 Ohio River Road Huntington, West Virginia 25702 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/01] | For all designated states Smc Electrical Products, Inc. 6072 Ohio River Road Huntington, West Virginia 25702 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOJIMA, Geraldo 1641 Bershire Hill Drive Duluth GA 30097 / US | [2007/01] | Representative(s) | Wagner & Geyer, et al Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/01] | Wagner & Geyer, et al Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/01] | Driver, Virginia Rozanne, et al Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London, WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 05767774.2 | 22.06.2005 | [2007/01] | WO2005US22046 | Priority number, date | US20040872538 | 22.04.2004 Original published format: US 872538 | [2007/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006002229 | Date: | 05.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1738454 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.10.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H02M1/12, H02M7/487, H02H7/122 | [2013/08] | CPC: |
H02M7/487 (EP,US);
H02H7/1227 (EP,US);
H02M1/38 (EP,US);
H02H3/025 (EP,US);
H02M1/32 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2007/01] | H02M1/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WECHSELRICHTERBRÜCKENSTEUERUNG MIT KURZSCHLUSS-SCHUTZVERFAHREN | [2007/01] | English: | INVERTER BRIDGE CONTROLLER IMPLEMENTING SHORT-CIRCUIT PROTECTION SCHEME | [2007/01] | French: | CONTROLEUR A PONT INVERSEUR IMPLEMENTANT UN SCHEMA DE PROTECTION CONTRE LES COURTS-CIRCUITS | [2007/01] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2006 | Search fee paid | 18.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2006 | Examination requested [2007/01] | 16.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/42] | 31.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2013 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1411624 (YASKAWA ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-16* the whole document * | International search | [AE]US7031172 (TANAKA YOSHIYUKI [JP], et al); | [A]US6687136 (MORIMOTO KEIKI [JP], et al); | [A]US6233164 (ZEE KUM YOONG [MK], et al); | [A]US4520437 (BOETTCHER JR CHARLES W [US], et al); | [A]US4439806 (BRAJDER ANTONIO [DE]) |