Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1784745

EP1784745 - USING EMOTICONS, SUCH AS FOR WIRELESS DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.08.2010
Database last updated on 09.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.08.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.09.2010  [2010/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AT & T Mobility II, LLC
5565 Glenridge Connector, Suite 1700
Atlanta, GA 30342 / US
[2009/51]
Former [2008/06]For all designated states
AT&T Mobility II LLC
5565 Glenridge Connector, Suite 1700
Atlanta, GA 30342 / US
Former [2007/20]For all designated states
Cingular Wireless II, LLC
5565 Glenridge Connector, Suite 1700
Atlanta, GA 30342 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CUNNINGHAM, Ivy
421 N 70th ST
Seattle, WA 98103 / US
02 / WHITE, Christopher
16408 N.E. 98th Court
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
 [2007/20]
Representative(s)Harding, Richard Patrick , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
4220 Nash Court
Oxford Business Park South
Oxford
OX4 2RU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Harding, Richard Patrick , et al
Marks & Clerk, 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford
OX4 2RU / GB
Former [2008/06]Harding, Richard Patrick , et al
Marks & Clerk, 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South
Oxford OX4 2RU / GB
Former [2007/20]Harding, Richard Patrick
Marks & Clerk, 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South
Oxford OX4 2RU / GB
Application number, filing date05772941.007.07.2005
[2007/20]
WO2005US24380
Priority number, dateUS20040588307P15.07.2004         Original published format: US 588307 P
US2005009251128.03.2005         Original published format: US 92511
[2007/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006019639
Date:23.02.2006
Language:EN
[2006/08]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1784745
Date:16.05.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2006
[2007/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US30.10.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.08.2009
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/24, // H04L12/58
[2009/36]
Former International [2007/20]G06F17/24
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2007/43]
Former [2007/20]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG VON EMOTICONS ZUM BEISPIEL FÜR DRAHTLOSE EINRICHTUNGEN[2007/20]
English:USING EMOTICONS, SUCH AS FOR WIRELESS DEVICES[2007/20]
French:UTILISATION D'EMOTICONES POUR DISPOSITIFS SANS FIL[2007/20]
Entry into regional phase25.01.2007National basic fee paid 
25.01.2007Search fee paid 
25.01.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
25.01.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.01.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.01.2007Examination requested  [2007/20]
18.11.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.03.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/37]
30.04.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2010/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
10.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
08.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[IY]US6629793  (MILLER STEVE [US]) [I] 1,3-5 * abstract * * Table 7 * * column 12, line 23 - column 14, line 1 * * figures 3,4 * [Y] 2;
 [YA]WO03067417  (KATHENAS INC [JP], et al) [Y] 2 * page 14, line 1 - page 15, line 17 * [A] 1,3-5
International search[X]US6629793  (MILLER STEVE [US])