|
11.06.2013 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2013 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.2013 |
Communication of the Registry during review procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.05.2013 |
Communication of the Registry during review procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.05.2013 |
Decision of the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure |
Appeal |
26 |
|
27.05.2013 |
Decision of the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure |
Appeal |
26 |
|
19.03.2013 |
Communication of the Registry during review procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.03.2013 |
Communication of the Registry during review procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.03.2013 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.03.2013 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.03.2013 |
Letter relating to review procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
19.02.2013 |
Letter relating to review procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
11.02.2013 |
Letter relating to review procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
11.02.2013 |
Letter relating to review procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
22.01.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.01.2013 |
Communication of the Enlarged Board of Appeal during review procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
16.01.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.01.2013 |
Communication of the Registry during review procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.01.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.2013 |
Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.01.2013 |
Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2012 |
Communication of the Registry during review procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
20.07.2012 |
Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.2012 |
Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.07.2012 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
23 |
|
18.07.2012 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.07.2012 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.07.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
18.07.2012 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.07.2012 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.07.2012 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.07.2012 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
18.07.2012 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
16.07.2012 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.07.2012 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
22 |
|
16.07.2012 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.2012 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.2012 |
Fax relating to review procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
16.07.2012 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.07.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.07.2012 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.2012 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
16.07.2012 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
16.07.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.2012 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.05.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.05.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.05.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.05.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.05.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.05.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.05.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.2012 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
26 |
|
07.05.2012 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
26 |
|
27.04.2012 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
63 |
|
27.04.2012 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
63 |
|
20.03.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.03.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.03.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.03.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
6 |
|
16.03.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
6 |
|
14.03.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.03.2012 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
28.02.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.02.2012 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.02.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.02.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.02.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.02.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.02.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
17.02.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
17.02.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
15.02.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.02.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.02.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.02.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.02.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.02.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.02.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.02.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.02.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
01.02.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
30.01.2012 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
23 |
|
30.01.2012 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
33 |
|
30.01.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.01.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.01.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.2012 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.01.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.01.2012 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.01.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.01.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.01.2012 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
8 |
|
09.01.2012 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.12.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.12.2011 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
17.10.2011 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.2011 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.10.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
7 |
|
05.10.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
7 |
|
05.10.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
7 |
|
05.10.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
7 |
|
05.10.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
8 |
|
05.10.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.10.2011 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
05.10.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
19 |
|
10.08.2011 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.08.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.08.2011 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
5 |
|
01.08.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
01.08.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.2011 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
01.08.2011 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
01.08.2011 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
01.08.2011 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
01.08.2011 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
01.08.2011 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
01.08.2011 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
24 |
|
01.08.2011 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
01.08.2011 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.08.2011 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
45 |
|
01.08.2011 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
01.08.2011 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
01.08.2011 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
01.08.2011 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
01.08.2011 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
01.08.2011 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
01.08.2011 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
01.08.2011 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
01.08.2011 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
01.08.2011 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
01.08.2011 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
01.08.2011 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
01.08.2011 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
26 |
|
01.08.2011 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
01.08.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
29.07.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
21.07.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
19.07.2011 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
5 |
|
14.07.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.07.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.07.2011 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.06.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2011 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
06.06.2011 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2011 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2011 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
06.06.2011 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
19 |
|
06.06.2011 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.06.2011 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2011 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2011 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2011 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2011 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2011 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.2011 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
39 |
|
07.03.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2011 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2011 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.03.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.03.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.03.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
04.03.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.2011 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.03.2011 |
Intervention of the assumed infringer |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.03.2011 |
Intervention of the assumed infringer |
Opposition |
6 |
|
04.03.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.03.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.03.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
04.03.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.03.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.03.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
29 |
|
04.03.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
04.03.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
04.03.2011 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.03.2011 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2011 |
Intervention of the assumed infringer |
Opposition |
55 |
|
03.03.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.03.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.03.2011 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2011 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2011 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2011 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.03.2011 |
Intervention of the assumed infringer |
Opposition |
9 |
|
01.03.2011 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2011 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2011 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2011 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2011 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.03.2011 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2011 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2011 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2011 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2011 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.02.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
31.01.2011 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.01.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
18.01.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
18.01.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.01.2011 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.01.2011 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.12.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.09.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.08.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2010 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.08.2010 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.08.2010 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.08.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.05.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.05.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.05.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.2010 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.2010 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.05.2010 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
30 |
|
13.04.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2010 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2010 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2010 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2010 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2010 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2009 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2009 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
36 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
46 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
14.12.2009 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
20 |
|
14.12.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
14.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
14.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
14.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
14.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
14.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
11.12.2009 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
37 |
|
11.12.2009 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
11 |
|
11.12.2009 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
11.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
11.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
11.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
11.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
11.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
11.12.2009 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2009 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.12.2009 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
08.12.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
29 |
|
08.12.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.12.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
08.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
08.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
08.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
08.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
08.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
08.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
12.02.2009 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.02.2009 |
Approval of request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2009 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2009 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.12.2008 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2008 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
10.12.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.12.2008 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.12.2008 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
10.12.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.12.2008 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2008 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2008 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
02.12.2008 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
05.11.2008 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.11.2008 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.11.2008 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2008 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
43 |
|
06.10.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.10.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.10.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.09.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2008 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.07.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.07.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.03.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.03.2008 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2008 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2008 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.02.2008 |
Patent document filed by a Third party |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
31.01.2008 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.01.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
03.01.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.01.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
06.11.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2007 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2007 |
Claim deemed abandoned |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2007 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
25.05.2007 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
12.04.2007 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2007 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2007 |
Refund order of filing/examination fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2007 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.03.2007 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.2007 |
Fax request to enter the European phase |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
08.01.2007 |
Fax request to enter the European phase |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
10.11.2006 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.10.2006 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
13.10.2006 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.10.2006 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.10.2006 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
7 |
|
13.10.2006 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
7 |
|
13.10.2006 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
13.10.2006 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
13.10.2006 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.10.2006 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.09.2006 |
Despatch of copy of consultation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.09.2006 |
Despatch of copy of consultation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.09.2006 |
Result of consultation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.09.2006 |
Result of consultation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.06.2006 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
27.06.2006 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
01.06.2006 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
01.06.2006 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.05.2006 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2006 |
Free text |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
18.04.2006 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
18.04.2006 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.04.2006 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.04.2006 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.04.2006 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
27.01.2006 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
49 |
|
05.01.2006 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
44 |
|
22.09.2005 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
09.09.2005 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
09.09.2005 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
09.09.2005 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
32 |
|
09.09.2005 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
09.09.2005 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
5 |