EP1784201 - PHYSIOLOGICALLY ACTIVE COMPOSITION AGAINST DIABETES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/20] | PHYSIOLOGICALLY ACTIVE COMPOSITION | ||
[2010/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.2011 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Phytomedics Incorporated 2245 RT. 13, Suite 103 Dyton, NJ 08810 / US | [2010/35] |
Former [2007/20] | For all designated states Cargill, Incorporated 15407 McGinty Road West Wayzata, MN 55391 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JÄGER, Ralf 2138 E. Lafayette Pl. Milwaukee, WI 53202 / US | 02 /
WENK, Hans-Henning Westminsterstr. 47 D-45470 Mülheim a.d. Ruhr / DE | 03 /
DIECK, Heike, Tom Thalhauser Strasse 21 D-85354 Freising / DE | 04 /
HOPPE, Hans, Ullrich Meisenstr. 14 85416 Lagenbach / DE | 05 /
RABELER, Roland Ludwig Thomastr. 2A 85356 Freising / DE | [2008/12] |
Former [2007/47] | 01 /
JÄGER, Ralf 2138 E. Lafayette Pl. Milwaukee, WI 53202 / US | ||
02 /
WENK, Hans-Henning Moltkeplatz 43 45138 Essen / DE | |||
03 /
DIECK, Heike, Tom Heinestrasse 11 85354 Freising / DE | |||
04 /
HOPPE, Hans, Ullrich Meisenstr. 14 85416 Lagenbach / DE | |||
05 /
RABELER, Roland Ludwig Thomastr. 2A 85356 Freising / DE | |||
Former [2007/21] | 01 /
JÄGER, Ralf 2138 E. Lafayette Pl. Milwaukee, WI 53202 / US | ||
02 /
WENK, Hans-Henning Moltkeplatz 43 45138 Essen / DE | |||
03 /
DIECK, Heike, Tom Thalhauser Str. 21 85354 Freising / DE | |||
04 /
HOPPE, Hans, Ullrich Meisenstr. 14 85416 Lagenbach / DE | |||
05 /
RABELER, Roland Ludwig Thomastr. 2A 85356 Freising / DE | |||
Former [2007/20] | 01 /
JÄGER, Ralf Erdinger Str. 31b 85356 Freising / DE | ||
02 /
WENK, Hans-Henning Jagdstr. 13 85356 Freising / DE | |||
03 /
DIECK, Heike, Tom Thalhauser Str. 21 85354 Freising / DE | |||
04 /
HOPPE, Hans, Ullrich Meisenstr. 14 85416 Lagenbach / DE | |||
05 /
RABELER, Roland Blutenburgstr. 19 80636 München / DE | Representative(s) | Böhm, Brigitte, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/20] | Böhm, Brigitte, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05776027.4 | 21.07.2005 | [2007/20] | WO2005EP07964 | Priority number, date | DE20041036047 | 24.07.2004 Original published format: DE102004036047 | [2007/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006010560 | Date: | 02.02.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1784201 | Date: | 16.05.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1784201 | Date: | 20.10.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K36/282, A61K31/352, A61K31/121, A61P5/48, A61K31/09, A61P3/10, A61K45/06 | [2010/16] | CPC: |
A61K36/282 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/352 (KR);
A23L13/72 (EP);
A23L33/105 (EP,US);
A61K31/121 (EP,KR,US);
A61K36/33 (US);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
A61P5/48 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/20] | A61K36/282, A61K31/352, A61K31/121, A61P5/48, A61K31/09 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PHYSIOLOGISCH AKTIVE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG GEGEN DIABETES | [2010/16] | English: | PHYSIOLOGICALLY ACTIVE COMPOSITION AGAINST DIABETES | [2010/16] | French: | COMPOSITION PHYSIOLOGIQUEMENT ACTIVE CONTRE LE DIABETE | [2010/16] |
Former [2007/20] | PHYSIOLOGISCH AKTIVE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | ||
Former [2007/20] | PHYSIOLOGICALLY ACTIVE COMPOSITION | ||
Former [2007/20] | COMPOSITION PHYSIOLOGIQUEMENT ACTIVE | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/20] | 25.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.09.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 20.10.2010 | CZ | 20.10.2010 | DK | 20.10.2010 | EE | 20.10.2010 | FI | 20.10.2010 | HU | 20.10.2010 | IE | 20.10.2010 | LT | 20.10.2010 | LV | 20.10.2010 | NL | 20.10.2010 | PL | 20.10.2010 | RO | 20.10.2010 | SE | 20.10.2010 | SI | 20.10.2010 | SK | 20.10.2010 | TR | 20.10.2010 | BG | 20.01.2011 | GR | 21.01.2011 | ES | 31.01.2011 | IS | 20.02.2011 | PT | 21.02.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 20.10.2010 | |
CZ | 20.10.2010 | ||
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
IE | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LV | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
PL | 20.10.2010 | ||
RO | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SK | 20.10.2010 | ||
TR | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
Former [2013/26] | CY | 20.10.2010 | |
CZ | 20.10.2010 | ||
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
IE | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LV | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
PL | 20.10.2010 | ||
RO | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SK | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | CZ | 20.10.2010 | |
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
IE | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LV | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
PL | 20.10.2010 | ||
RO | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SK | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | CZ | 20.10.2010 | |
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
IE | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LV | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
PL | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SK | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | CZ | 20.10.2010 | |
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
IE | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LV | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/32] | FI | 20.10.2010 | |
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LV | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | FI | 20.10.2010 | |
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LV | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | FI | 20.10.2010 | |
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LV | 20.10.2010 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 20.10.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0183436 (INT FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES INC [US], et al) [X] 1,13,22 * claims 1,2,22,23 *; | [X]WO9938479 (EDWARDS BOBBY GENE [US]) [X] 1,5-8,13,17,18,22 * claims 5-7,38-50 *; | [X]WO03020026 (UNIV RUTGERS [US], et al) [X] 1-23 * claims 1-10 * * claim 20 * * page 6, line 35 - page 7, line 36 *; | [PX] - MADUREIRA ET AL, "A new sesquiterpene-coumarin ether and a new abietane diterpene and their effects as inhibitors of P-glycoprotein", PLANTA MEDICA, (200412), vol. 26, no. 6, XP018001499 [PX] 1-8,13,22 * the whole document * | [X] - MARES D ET AL, "ANTIDERMATOPHYTIC ACTIVITY OF HERNIARIN IN PREPARATION OF CHAMOMILLA RECUTITA (L.) RAUSCHERT", PLANTES MEDICINALES ET PHYTOTHERAPIE, ANGERS, FR, (1993), vol. 26, ISSN 0032-0994, pages 91 - 100, XP000917217 [X] 1-8,13,17,22 * page 99, paragraph 3 * * page 91, paragraph 1 * | [X] - JAYASINGHE L ET AL, "Antifungal constituents of the stem bark of Bridelia retusa", PHYTOCHEMISTRY, PERGAMON PRESS, GB, (200302), vol. 62, no. 4, ISSN 0031-9422, pages 637 - 641, XP004404091 [X] 1-8,13,17,22 * page 641, paragraph 3.3.6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0031-9422(02)00623-4 | [X] - MALLAVARAPU G R ET AL, "COMPOSITION OF THE ESSENTIAL OIL OF CYMBOPOGON-TRAVANCORENSIS", PLANTA MEDICA, (1992), vol. 58, no. 2, ISSN 0032-0943, pages 219 - 220, XP008061012 [X] 1-8,13 * table 1 * | [X] - XIAO Y-Q ET AL, "STUDIES ON THE CHEMICAL CONSTITUENTS OF ARTEMISIA-ANOMALA", ACTA BOTANICA SINICA, (1986), vol. 28, no. 3, ISSN 0577-7496, pages 307 - 310, XP008061015 [X] 1-9,13,22,23 * abstract * | [X] - KOMIYA T ET AL, "STUDIES ON INCHINKO PART 2 STUDIES ON THE COMPOUNDS RELATED TO CAPILLARISIN AND FLAVONOIDS", YAKUGAKU ZASSHI, (1976), vol. 96, no. 7, ISSN 0031-6903, pages 855 - 862, XP008061013 [X] 1-9,13,22,23 * abstract * * page 85 * | [A] - OKADA Y ET AL, "Search for naturally occuring substances to prevent the complications of diabetes. II. Inhibitory effect of coumarin and flavonoid derivatives on bovine lens aldose reductase and rabbit platelet aggregation", CHEMICAL AND PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN, PHARMACEUTICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, TOKYO, JP, (199508), vol. 43, no. 8, ISSN 0009-2363, pages 1385 - 1387, XP002958799 | [A] - FONSECA F N ET AL, "Critical assessment of electrolyte systems for the capillary electrophoresis analysis of phenolic compounds in herbal extracts", JOURNAL OF MICROCOLUMN SEPARATIONS, PROVO, UT, US, (2001), vol. 13, no. 6, pages 227 - 235, XP002961061 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/mcs.1047 |