|
17.06.2015 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2014 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2014 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.07.2014 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2014 |
Communication regarding the forthcoming grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.06.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2014 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2014 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.06.2014 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.06.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.02.2014 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.02.2014 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.02.2014 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2014 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
48 |
|
11.10.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.10.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.09.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.2013 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.2013 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
19 |
|
27.09.2013 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
09.05.2012 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
02.05.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
9 |
|
05.08.2010 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.08.2010 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.2010 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
15.01.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.09.2009 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.09.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.09.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.09.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
30 |
|
03.09.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
03.09.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.08.2009 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.08.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.08.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.08.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.08.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
06.08.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.08.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.08.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.08.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.08.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
06.08.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
06.08.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
06.08.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.08.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.07.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2009 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
15.07.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.07.2009 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2009 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.07.2009 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.07.2009 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.07.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2009 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2009 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2009 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2009 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.05.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
30.04.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2009 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2009 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.02.2009 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2009 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.08.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
25.08.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.08.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.08.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.08.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.08.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.04.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.04.2008 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2008 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.2008 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
14.02.2008 |
Designation deemed to be withdrawn (loss of partial rights) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2008 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2008 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.01.2008 |
Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.01.2008 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
28.11.2007 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2007 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.10.2007 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.12.2006 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.12.2006 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
59 |
|
14.09.2005 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
14.09.2005 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
9 |
|
14.09.2005 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
30 |
|
14.09.2005 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
13 |