Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1787226 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1787226



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 552
10.12.2019 F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
20.09.2017 F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
10.07.2017 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
29.05.2017 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
26.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
26.05.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 8
26.05.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
26.05.2017 Claims Appeal 5
26.05.2017 Claims Appeal 5
26.05.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
26.05.2017 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 13
26.05.2017 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 1
31.03.2017 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 2
27.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
27.03.2017 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Appeal 2
27.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
27.03.2017 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
26.01.2017 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
24.01.2017 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
18.01.2017 Annex to a communication Search / examination 10
18.01.2017 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
18.01.2017 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
18.01.2017 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 18
18.01.2017 Means of redress Search / examination 2
22.12.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
22.12.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
22.12.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
26.10.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.10.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
26.10.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 4
19.09.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
19.09.2016 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
14.07.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
28.06.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 14
28.06.2016 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
28.06.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
29.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
29.03.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 8
29.03.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
29.03.2016 Claims Search / examination 5
29.03.2016 Claims Search / examination 5
29.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
29.03.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
19.11.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 23
19.11.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
04.04.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
04.04.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
19.03.2015 Decision of the Board of Appeal Search / examination 6
19.03.2015 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 6
19.03.2015 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
06.03.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.03.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
26.02.2015 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
23.02.2015 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
12.02.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
12.02.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
12.02.2015 Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings Appeal 1
26.01.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
26.01.2015 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 1
20.01.2015 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
14.10.2014 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 4
07.10.2014 F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
26.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
26.09.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
26.09.2014 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Appeal 2
30.05.2014 Annex to the communication Appeal 10
30.05.2014 Communication from the Examining Division Appeal 2
22.04.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Appeal 1
17.04.2014 Document concerning representation Appeal 2
17.03.2014 Decision on interlocutory revision Appeal 1
13.03.2014 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
04.02.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
04.02.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 6
04.02.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 8
04.02.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 6
04.02.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
04.02.2014 Claims Appeal 5
04.02.2014 Claims Appeal 5
04.02.2014 Claims Appeal 5
04.02.2014 Claims Appeal 5
04.02.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
04.02.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 8
04.12.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
04.12.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
04.12.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
21.10.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
24.09.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
24.09.2013 Decision to refuse according to the state of the file Search / examination 2
24.09.2013 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
24.09.2013 Means of redress Search / examination 2
10.09.2013 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 1
10.09.2013 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 1
10.09.2013 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
10.09.2013 Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings Search / examination 1
04.09.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 9
04.09.2013 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
12.08.2013 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 1
09.08.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
09.08.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
09.08.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
09.08.2013 Claims Search / examination 5
09.08.2013 Claims Search / examination 5
09.08.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.08.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 8
15.04.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
05.04.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
26.03.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
26.03.2013 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
26.03.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
15.11.2012 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
09.11.2012 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 2
29.10.2009 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
23.10.2009 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 2
15.05.2009 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 8
15.05.2009 Claims Search / examination 5
15.05.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
13.05.2009 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 8
13.05.2009 Claims Search / examination 5
13.05.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
06.03.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
04.03.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.03.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.11.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
03.11.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
31.08.2007 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
31.08.2007 Priority document Search / examination 36
15.06.2007 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 36
15.06.2007 Priority document not received from IB during Euro-PCT phase Search / examination 1
04.05.2007 Reply by International Bureau Search / examination 1
25.04.2007 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
20.04.2007 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
29.03.2007 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
14.03.2007 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
14.03.2007 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
13.03.2007 Fax request to enter the European phase Search / examination 8
27.02.2007 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
29.12.2006 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
15.03.2006 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 16
23.02.2006 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
23.02.2006 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 27