EP1802815 - ALTERNATING SHOWER COMPRISING A SHOWER INTERVAL SWITCH FOR CONTROLLING AN ALTERNATING HOT AND COLD SHOWER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Westarp, Bernt Am Butterbusch 16 40882 Ratingen / DE | [2007/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/27] | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Mörikestrasse 18 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/27] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Mörikestrasse 18 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 05779399.4 | 23.08.2005 | [2007/27] | WO2005DE01488 | Priority number, date | DE20042013195U | 23.08.2004 Original published format: DE 202004013195 U | [2007/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006021201 | Date: | 02.03.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1802815 | Date: | 04.07.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1802815 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | E03C1/04, E03C1/05 | [2007/27] | CPC: |
E03C1/0408 (EP,US);
E03C1/055 (EP,US);
Y10T137/87652 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WECHSELDUSCHE MIT EINER INTERVALLSCHALTEINRICHTUNG ZUM STEUERN EINES ABWECHSELNDEN HEISS- UND KALTDUSCHENS | [2007/27] | English: | ALTERNATING SHOWER COMPRISING A SHOWER INTERVAL SWITCH FOR CONTROLLING AN ALTERNATING HOT AND COLD SHOWER | [2007/27] | French: | CIRCUIT DE DOUCHE A INTERVALLE ET DOUCHE A ALTERNANCE EQUIPEE DE CE CIRCUIT | [2007/27] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/27] | 06.07.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2007 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.09.2007 | 31.08.2010 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   24.02.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 13.04.2011 | CZ | 13.04.2011 | DK | 13.04.2011 | EE | 13.04.2011 | FI | 13.04.2011 | HU | 13.04.2011 | IE | 13.04.2011 | IT | 13.04.2011 | LT | 13.04.2011 | LV | 13.04.2011 | NL | 13.04.2011 | PL | 13.04.2011 | RO | 13.04.2011 | SE | 13.04.2011 | SI | 13.04.2011 | SK | 13.04.2011 | TR | 13.04.2011 | BG | 13.07.2011 | GR | 14.07.2011 | ES | 24.07.2011 | IS | 13.08.2011 | PT | 16.08.2011 | AT | 23.08.2011 | GB | 23.08.2011 | LU | 23.08.2011 | BE | 31.08.2011 | CH | 31.08.2011 | FR | 31.08.2011 | LI | 31.08.2011 | MC | 31.08.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 13.04.2011 | ||
IT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
TR | 13.04.2011 | ||
BG | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
AT | 23.08.2011 | ||
GB | 23.08.2011 | ||
LU | 23.08.2011 | ||
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
FR | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 13.04.2011 | ||
IT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
BG | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
AT | 23.08.2011 | ||
GB | 23.08.2011 | ||
LU | 23.08.2011 | ||
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
FR | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 13.04.2011 | ||
IT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
AT | 23.08.2011 | ||
GB | 23.08.2011 | ||
LU | 23.08.2011 | ||
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
FR | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/07] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 13.04.2011 | ||
IT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
AT | 23.08.2011 | ||
GB | 23.08.2011 | ||
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
FR | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 13.04.2011 | ||
IT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
GB | 23.08.2011 | ||
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
FR | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 13.04.2011 | ||
IT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
GB | 23.08.2011 | ||
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/25] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 13.04.2011 | ||
IT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 13.04.2011 | ||
IT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/18] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 13.04.2011 | |
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 13.04.2011 | |
PT | 16.08.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5121511 (SAKAMOTO JYUNICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 6 *; | [Y]DE19501716 (GROHE KG HANS [DE]) [Y] 20 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE19702358 (GROHE KG HANS [DE]) [Y] 10-19 * figure 2 *; | [A]EP1170424 (HANSA METALLWERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1-21* the whole document *; | [XY]DE20319810U (WESTARP BERNT [DE]) [X] 1-9 * the whole document * [Y] 10-20 |