EP1718913 - RECEIVER ASSEMBLY FOR FIREARM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.10.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rock River Arms, Inc. 101 Noble Street Cleveland, IL 61241 / US | [2006/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FINN, James 619 N. First Street Alpha, Illinois 61413 / US | [2006/45] | Representative(s) | Taylor, Adam David, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/52] | Taylor, Adam David, et al Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2010/33] | Taylor, Adam David, et al Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2010/33] | Hall, Matthew Benjamin Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2006/45] | Hall, Matthew Benjamin Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 05780010.4 | 08.02.2005 | [2006/45] | WO2005US03915 | Priority number, date | US20040774556 | 09.02.2004 Original published format: US 774556 | [2006/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005116565 | Date: | 08.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1718913 | Date: | 08.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1718913 | Date: | 25.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.07.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F41A17/38, F41A17/42, F41A35/06 | [2013/37] | CPC: |
F41A35/06 (EP,US);
F41A17/38 (EP,US);
F41A17/42 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/45] | F41A9/61, F41A9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/45] | Title | German: | AUFNAHMEANORDNUNG FÜR EINE SCHUSSWAFFE | [2006/45] | English: | RECEIVER ASSEMBLY FOR FIREARM | [2006/45] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE CHASSIS POUR ARME A FEU | [2006/45] | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.2006 | Search fee paid | 01.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 01.09.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/45] | 20.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 26.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.02.2005 | AT | 25.12.2013 | BE | 25.12.2013 | BG | 25.12.2013 | CY | 25.12.2013 | CZ | 25.12.2013 | DK | 25.12.2013 | EE | 25.12.2013 | ES | 25.12.2013 | FI | 25.12.2013 | LT | 25.12.2013 | MC | 25.12.2013 | NL | 25.12.2013 | PL | 25.12.2013 | RO | 25.12.2013 | SE | 25.12.2013 | SI | 25.12.2013 | SK | 25.12.2013 | TR | 25.12.2013 | IE | 08.02.2014 | LU | 08.02.2014 | FR | 28.02.2014 | GR | 26.03.2014 | IS | 25.04.2014 | PT | 28.04.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 08.02.2005 | |
AT | 25.12.2013 | ||
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
BG | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IE | 08.02.2014 | ||
LU | 08.02.2014 | ||
FR | 28.02.2014 | ||
GR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
BG | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IE | 08.02.2014 | ||
LU | 08.02.2014 | ||
FR | 28.02.2014 | ||
GR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
BG | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IE | 08.02.2014 | ||
LU | 08.02.2014 | ||
FR | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IE | 08.02.2014 | ||
LU | 08.02.2014 | ||
FR | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IE | 08.02.2014 | ||
LU | 08.02.2014 | ||
FR | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IE | 08.02.2014 | ||
LU | 08.02.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
LU | 08.02.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/44] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
LU | 08.02.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | BE | 25.12.2013 | |
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/34] | BE | 25.12.2013 | |
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 25.12.2013 | |
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 25.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4326353 (LUDWIG WALTER, et al) [Y] 9 * abstract ** column 2, line 22 - line 68 *; | [Y]US4974356 (KELSEY JR CHARLES C [US], et al) [Y] 7,8,10,15 * figures 1,2,4,5 * * column 1, line 67 - column 2, line 2 * * column 5, line 62 - column 6, line 2 *; | [XY]US5519954 (GARRETT ROBERT H [US]) [X] 1-6,11-14 * abstract * * column 1, line 48 - line 61 * * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 4 * * column 7, line 44 - column 8, line 13 * [Y] 7-10,15 | International search | [Y]US4058922 (ELBE RONALD E, et al); | [Y]US4326353 (LUDWIG WALTER, et al); | [Y]US4709496 (JOHNSON DAVID A [US]); | [X]US5519954 (GARRETT ROBERT H [US]) | by applicant | US4326353 | US4974356 |