|
19.03.2019 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
20 |
|
29.01.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.2019 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
18 |
|
21.01.2019 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.2019 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.10.2018 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.10.2018 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.10.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.10.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.10.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.10.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.10.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.10.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.10.2018 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.2018 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.09.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
04.09.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.08.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.08.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.08.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.08.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.08.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.08.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.08.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.08.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
7 |
|
29.08.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.08.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
7 |
|
29.08.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
7 |
|
29.08.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
29.08.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.08.2018 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.08.2018 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
29.08.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.08.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.08.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.08.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.08.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.08.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.08.2018 |
Description |
Appeal |
7 |
|
29.08.2018 |
Description |
Appeal |
5 |
|
29.08.2018 |
Description |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.08.2018 |
Description |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.08.2018 |
Description |
Appeal |
7 |
|
29.08.2018 |
Description |
Appeal |
7 |
|
29.08.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.08.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.08.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.08.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.08.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.08.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.06.2018 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
7 |
|
01.06.2018 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
7 |
|
04.05.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.2018 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.04.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.03.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.2018 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.03.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2018 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.2018 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.03.2018 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.02.2018 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.11.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.11.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.11.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.11.2017 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.08.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.08.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.2017 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
16.08.2017 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
16.08.2017 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
54 |
|
16.08.2017 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
16.08.2017 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.2017 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
13.06.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.06.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.06.2017 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.06.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.06.2017 |
Request for change of name -opponent |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.06.2017 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.06.2017 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.06.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.12.2015 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.10.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.10.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.10.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.10.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
06.10.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
06.10.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
06.10.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
06.10.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
06.10.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.10.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.10.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
06.10.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
06.10.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
06.10.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
06.10.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
06.10.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.10.2015 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
33 |
|
06.10.2015 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.05.2015 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
23 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
27 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
24 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
92 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
20 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
16 |
|
02.04.2015 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.03.2015 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.03.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.03.2015 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
19.01.2015 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2015 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.01.2015 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
19.01.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2015 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2014 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.11.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2014 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.11.2014 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.11.2014 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
7 |
|
11.11.2014 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
11.11.2014 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.11.2014 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.11.2014 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.11.2014 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.11.2014 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
11.11.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.11.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.09.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.09.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.09.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.2014 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.2014 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.06.2014 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.06.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.06.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.2014 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.06.2014 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.06.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.2014 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
30.05.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.04.2014 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
11 |
|
23.04.2014 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
11 |
|
23.04.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.01.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.01.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.01.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
14.01.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
05.12.2013 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.11.2013 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.11.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.11.2013 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2013 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.09.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.09.2013 |
Annex |
Opposition |
22 |
|
20.09.2013 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.09.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.09.2013 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2013 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.07.2013 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.04.2013 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.04.2013 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.03.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.03.2013 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.2013 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.03.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.2013 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.02.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
92 |
|
28.02.2013 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
28.02.2013 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
28.02.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
28.02.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
28.02.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
28.02.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.02.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
28.02.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
28.02.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
28.02.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
28.02.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
28.02.2013 |
Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
19.12.2012 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.12.2012 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
07.05.2012 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.04.2012 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2012 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.04.2012 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.12.2011 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.12.2011 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.12.2011 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2011 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
47 |
|
28.01.2011 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.01.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.01.2011 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.01.2011 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2011 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.01.2011 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.01.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.01.2011 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.01.2011 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2011 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.07.2010 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2010 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2010 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.07.2010 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.03.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.04.2007 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2007 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
18.04.2007 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2007 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.03.2007 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.02.2007 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2007 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.01.2007 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.03.2006 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
02.03.2006 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.03.2006 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
48 |