EP1799921 - Toilet cover with dosing dispenser [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/26] | TOILET DOSING DISPENSER | ||
[2019/48] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Symrise AG Mühlenfeldstrasse 1 37603 Holzminden / DE | [2020/13] |
Former [2010/52] | For all designated states Symrise AG Mühlenfeldstrasse 1 37603 Holzminden / DE | ||
Former [2007/26] | For all designated states Symrise GmbH & Co. KG Mühlenfeldstrasse 1 37603 Holzminden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOOFT, Jan Burgbergblick 6 37603 Holzminden / DE | [2007/26] | Representative(s) | Fabry, Bernd, et al IP2 Patentanwalts GmbH Schlossstrasse 523 41238 Mönchengladbach / DE | [2014/24] |
Former [2013/28] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2010/52] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Am Kaffee-Quartier 3 28217 Bremen / DE | ||
Former [2007/26] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 05792119.9 | 06.10.2005 | [2007/26] | WO2005EP55060 | Priority number, date | DE20041049138 | 07.10.2004 Original published format: DE102004049138 | DE20051001794 | 13.01.2005 Original published format: DE102005001794 | [2007/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006040293 | Date: | 20.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1799921 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1799921 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | E03D9/00, E03D9/02 | [2007/26] | CPC: |
B65D83/0427 (EP,US);
A47K13/24 (EP,US);
E03D9/005 (EP,US);
B65D2583/0472 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/13] |
Former [2007/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Toilettendeckel mit einem Dosierspender | [2019/48] | English: | Toilet cover with dosing dispenser | [2019/48] | French: | Couvercle de toilette avec un distributeur | [2019/48] |
Former [2007/26] | DOSIERSPENDER FÜR TOILETTE | ||
Former [2007/26] | TOILET DOSING DISPENSER | ||
Former [2007/26] | DISTRIBUTEUR DOSEUR POUR TOILETTES | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.2007 | Search fee paid | 07.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/26] | 04.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 26.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 30.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 22.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.10.2005 | CY | 25.03.2020 | CZ | 25.03.2020 | DK | 25.03.2020 | EE | 25.03.2020 | ES | 25.03.2020 | FI | 25.03.2020 | IT | 25.03.2020 | LT | 25.03.2020 | LV | 25.03.2020 | MC | 25.03.2020 | NL | 25.03.2020 | PL | 25.03.2020 | RO | 25.03.2020 | SE | 25.03.2020 | SI | 25.03.2020 | SK | 25.03.2020 | TR | 25.03.2020 | BG | 25.06.2020 | GR | 26.06.2020 | IS | 25.07.2020 | PT | 18.08.2020 | AT | 06.10.2020 | IE | 06.10.2020 | LU | 06.10.2020 | BE | 31.10.2020 | CH | 31.10.2020 | LI | 31.10.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2022/26] | CZ | 25.03.2020 | |
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
ES | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SI | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
TR | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
AT | 06.10.2020 | ||
IE | 06.10.2020 | ||
LU | 06.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2022/07] | CZ | 25.03.2020 | |
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
ES | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SI | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
AT | 06.10.2020 | ||
IE | 06.10.2020 | ||
LU | 06.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | CZ | 25.03.2020 | |
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
ES | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SI | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
IE | 06.10.2020 | ||
LU | 06.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | CZ | 25.03.2020 | |
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
ES | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SI | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
LU | 06.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 25.03.2020 | |
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
ES | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SI | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
LU | 06.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | CZ | 25.03.2020 | |
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
ES | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SI | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
LU | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | CZ | 25.03.2020 | |
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
ES | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SI | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | CZ | 25.03.2020 | |
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
ES | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | CZ | 25.03.2020 | |
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
ES | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 25.03.2020 | |
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
ES | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 25.03.2020 | |
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 25.03.2020 | |
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 25.03.2020 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2950959 (VE RELLE WILLIAM H) [X] 1,2,5,6,33-35 * page 1, line 15 - line 18 * * figures 1,3,12,13 * * column 1, line 25 - line 30 * * column 2, line 17 - line 51 *; | [X]US3840914 (TUFTS W, et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 1, line 23 - line 61 *; | [PX]EP1505215 (BURETTE LUCIEN [BE]) [PX] 1-4,6,7,9,23,32-36 * paragraph [0001]; figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0038] *; | [A]DE10246581 (BIELAGK UDO [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0021] *; | [A]DE10123201 (ROEDIGER NICKY [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0006] * | Examination | US713978 | US412273 | by applicant | US2950959 | US3840914 |