EP1789924 - SYSTEM AND METHOD OF PREDICTING FUTURE FRACTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.03.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.04.2012 [2012/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ImaTx, Inc. 11 North Avenue Burlington, MA 01803 / US | [2011/02] |
Former [2008/14] | For all designated states Imaging Therapeutics, Inc. 400 Seaport Ct. Suite 250 Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | ||
Former [2007/22] | For all designated states Imaging Therapeutics, Inc. 323 C Vintage Park Drive Foster City, CA 94404 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARNAUD, Claude 1 Starboard Court Mill Valley California 94941 / US | 02 /
LANG, Philipp 7 Fair Oaks Terrace Lexington Massachusetts 02420 / US | 03 /
LIEW, Siau-Way 901 Sunnyview Drive Pinole CA 94564 / US | 04 /
STEINES, Daniel 3627 Lupine Avenue Palo Alto CA 94303 / US | 05 /
VARGAS-VORACEK, Rene 1119 Lorne Way Sunnyvale CA 94087 / US | [2007/22] | Representative(s) | Grund, Martin Grund Intellectual Property Group Patentanwälte und Solicitor PartG mbB Steinsdorfstraße 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | Grund, Martin GRUND Intellectual Property Group Postfach 44 05 16 80754 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/22] | Grund, Martin Grund Intellectual Property Group Postfach 44 05 16 80754 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05797661.5 | 16.09.2005 | [2007/22] | WO2005US33131 | Priority number, date | US20040610447P | 16.09.2004 Original published format: US 610447 P | [2007/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006034018 | Date: | 30.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1789924 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/00, A61B5/00 | [2007/22] | CPC: |
A61B6/505 (EP,US);
A61B5/7275 (US);
A61B5/4509 (US);
A61B6/52 (US);
A61B8/52 (US);
G01R33/54 (US);
G06T7/0012 (EP,US);
G06T7/41 (EP,US);
G06T7/62 (EP,US);
G06T7/66 (EP,US);
A61B2576/02 (US);
A61B6/583 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VORHERSAGE VON ZUKÜNFTIGEN BRÜCHEN | [2007/22] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD OF PREDICTING FUTURE FRACTURES | [2007/22] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE PREDICTION DE FUTURES FRACTURES | [2007/22] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/22] | 16.05.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/16] | 02.12.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/16] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.01.2009 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 19.11.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 19.11.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   26.10.2009 | 30.09.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2004062495 (IMAGING THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-52,56-83* the whole document * |