blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1797038

EP1797038 - THERMODYNAMICALLY STABLE FORM OF BAY 43-9006 TOSYLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  03.04.2020
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip12.02.2021Petition for review: decisionpublished on 17.03.2021  [2021/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bayer HealthCare LLC
100 Bayer Boulevard
Whippany, NJ 07981 / US
[2015/04]
Former [2013/08]For all designated states
Bayer HealthCare LLC
555 White Plains Road
Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US
Former [2011/34]For all designated states
Bayer Pharma Aktiengesellschaft
Müllerstrasse 178
13353 Berlin / DE
Former [2009/38]For all designated states
Bayer Schering Pharma Aktiengesellschaft
Müllerstrasse 178
13353 Berlin / DE
Former [2009/37]For all designated states
Bayer Schering Pharma AG
Müllerstrasse 178
13353 Berlin / DE
Former [2007/25]For all designated states
Bayer HealthCare AG
51368 Leverkusen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / GRUNENBERG, Alfons
Gneisenaustr. 15
41539 Dormagen / DE
02 / LENZ, Jana
Benzstr. 7
42117 Wuppertal / DE
 [2007/25]
Representative(s)Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB
Postfach 860 820
81635 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/34]Weiss, Wolfgang, et al
Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Richard-Strauss-Strasse 80
81679 München / DE
Former [2013/08]BIP Patents
c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH
Creative Campus Monheim
Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10
40789 Monheim / DE
Former [2012/24](deleted)
Application number, filing date05797740.720.09.2005
[2007/25]
WO2005EP10119
Priority number, dateEP2004002313029.09.2004         Original published format: EP 04023130
[2007/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2006034797
Date:06.04.2006
Language:EN
[2006/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1797038
Date:20.06.2007
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2007/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1797038
Date:13.06.2012
Language:EN
[2012/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.04.2006
ClassificationIPC:C07D213/81, A61K31/44, A61P35/00
[2007/25]
CPC:
C07D213/81 (EP,KR,NO,US); A61K31/44 (NO); A61P35/00 (EP,NO);
A61P35/02 (EP); A61P43/00 (EP); A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/25]
Extension statesHR02.05.2007
TitleGerman:THERMODYNAMISCH STABILE FORM VON BAY 43-9006 TOSYLAT[2007/25]
English:THERMODYNAMICALLY STABLE FORM OF BAY 43-9006 TOSYLATE[2007/25]
French:FORME THERMODYNAMIQUEMENT STABLE DE TOSYLATE DE BAY 43-9006[2007/25]
Entry into regional phase02.05.2007National basic fee paid 
02.05.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
02.05.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.05.2007Examination requested  [2007/25]
14.08.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.02.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.06.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.09.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.03.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.09.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.01.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.05.2012Fee for grant paid
04.05.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.08.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  12.03.2013  18.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH
Else-Krömer-Strasse 1
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH
Patent Department
Borkenberg 14
61440 Oberursel / DE
 02  13.03.2013    ADMISSIBLE
Biofer S.p.A.
Via Canina 2
41036 Medolla / IT
Opponent's representative
Modiano, Micaela Nadia
Modiano & Partners
Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
 [N/P]
Former [2013/17]
Opponent(s)01  12.03.2013  18.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH
Else-Krömer-Strasse 1
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH
Patent Department
Borkenberg 14
61440 Oberursel / DE
 02  13.03.2013    ADMISSIBLE
Biofer S.p.A.
Via Canina 2
41036 Medolla / IT
Opponent's representative
Modiano, Micaela Nadia
Modiano & Partners (IT)
Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
Former [2013/16]
Opponent(s)01  12.03.2013    ADMISSIBLE
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH
Else-Krömer-Strasse 1
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH
Patent Department
Borkenberg 14
61440 Oberursel / DE
22.04.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
31.10.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
28.05.2014Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06)
05.12.2014Reply to a communication from the opposition division
12.07.2016Date of oral proceedings
25.08.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
07.11.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
14.01.2020Legal effect of revocation of patent [2020/19]
08.04.2020Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition30.12.2016Appeal received No.  T0041/17
16.03.2017Statement of grounds filed
14.01.2020Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
14.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
22.01.2020Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Petition(s) for review:10.06.2020Petition for review received
 Number:  R0008/20
 for appeal No.  T0041/17-3302
 Petitioner:  APPR
10.12.2020Decision:  Petition for review obviously unsubstantiated only.
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
22.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
30.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
30.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[YD]WO03068228  (BAYER AG [US], et al) [YD] 1-22 * claims 13,15,21,22 *;
 [Y]  - HOTTE S J ET AL, "BAY 43-9006: EARLY CLINICAL DATA IN PATIENTS WITH ADVANCED SOLID MALIGNANCIES", CURRENT PHARMACEUTICAL DESIGN, BENTHAM SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, SCHIPHOL, NL, (2002), vol. 8, no. 25, ISSN 1381-6128, pages 2249 - 2253, XP001145745 [Y] 1-22 * page 2250, column L *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/1381612023393053
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.