EP1794679 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MOVING PROCESSES BETWEEN ISOLATION ENVIRONMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.11.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Citrix Systems, Inc. 851 W. Cypress Creek Road Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309 / US | [2007/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LABORCZFALVI, Lee George, c/o Citrix Systems Australasia R & D Pty Ltd., Level 3, 1 Julius Av. North Ryde, NSW 2113 / AU | 02 /
ROYCHOUDHRY, Anil, c/o Citrix Systems Australasia R & D Pty Ltd., Level 3, 1 Julius Av. North Ryde, NSW 2113 / AU | 03 /
BORZYCKI, Andrew Gerard, c/o Citrix Systems Australasia R & D Pty Ltd., Level 3, 1 Julius Av. North Ryde, NSW 2113 / AU | 04 /
CHIN, Huai Chiun, c/o Citrix systems Australasia R & D Pty Ltd., Level 3, 1 Julius Av. North Ryde, NSW 2113 / AU | 05 /
MAZZAFERRI, Richard James, c/o Citrix Systems Australasia R & D Pty Ltd., Level 3, 1 Julius Av. North Ryde, NSW 2113 / AU | 06 /
BISSETT, Nicholas Alexander, c/o Citrix Systems Australasia R & D Pty Ltd., Level 3, 1 Julius Av. North Ryde, NSW 2113 / AU | 07 /
MUIR, Jeffrey Dale, c/o Citrix Systems Australasia R & D Pty Ltd., Level 3, 1 Julius Av. North Ryde, NSW 2113 / AU | [2007/24] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/24] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05803735.9 | 23.09.2005 | [2007/24] | WO2005US33994 | Priority number, date | US20040711737 | 30.09.2004 Original published format: US 711737 | US20040711736 | 30.09.2004 Original published format: US 711736 | US20040711735 | 30.09.2004 Original published format: US 711735 | US20040711734 | 30.09.2004 Original published format: US 711734 | US20040711733 | 30.09.2004 Original published format: US 711733 | US20040711732 | 30.09.2004 Original published format: US 711732 | US20040956723 | 01.10.2004 Original published format: US 956723 | US20050231284 | 19.09.2005 Original published format: US 231284 | US20050231316 | 19.09.2005 Original published format: US 231316 | US20050231317 | 19.09.2005 Original published format: US 231317 | US20050231315 | 19.09.2005 Original published format: US 231315 | US20050231370 | 19.09.2005 Original published format: US 231370 | [2007/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006039181 | Date: | 13.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1794679 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/46 | [2007/24] | CPC: |
G06F9/45537 (EP,KR);
G06F9/44552 (EP,KR);
G06F9/445 (EP);
G06F9/455 (EP,KR);
G06F2221/033 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERLAGERN VON PROZESSEN ZWISCHEN ISOLATIONSUMGEBUNGEN | [2007/24] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MOVING PROCESSES BETWEEN ISOLATION ENVIRONMENTS | [2007/24] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR DEPLACER DES PROCESSUS ENTRE DES ENVIRONNEMENTS D'ISOLATION | [2007/24] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/24] | 30.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/49] | 18.06.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.07.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 16.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.06.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0045262 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-26* page 2, line 4 - page 6, line 11 *; | [X]WO0125894 (EJASENT INC [US], et al) [X] 1-26 * page 1, line 12 - page 3, line 10 * * page 9, line 16 - page 18, line 30 *; | [A]WO0195094 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-26 * page 1, line 1 - page 7, line 3 *; | [X]US2003101292 (FISHER JOSEPH A [US], et al) [X] 1-26 * page 1, column L, paragraph 1 - page 1, column R, paragraph 10 * | by applicant | WO0125894 | US2003101292 |