EP1788923 - A DISHWASHER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.12.2014 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.01.2015 [2015/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yoido-dong Yongdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/22] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yoido-dong Yongdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Choi, Seung Bong Sinwol-dong 44-9 Changwon-si, Gyeongsangnam-do 641-837 / KR | 02 /
Yoon, Sangheon Haan Jukong 9-Danji APT. 910-204 Gwangmyeong-si, Gyeonggi-do 423-761 / KR | 03 /
Park, Nungseo Woosung Apt. 106-206, Jayang-dong 579 Gwangjin-gu, Seoul 143-190 / KR | 04 /
Cho, Hung Myong Dongwon APT 102-302, Chojun-ri 558-2 Jillye-myeon Gimhae-si, Gyeongsangnam-do 621-884 / KR | 05 /
Han, Dae Yeong Jungkong APT. 3-Danji 302-1305, Deungchon 3-dong Gangseo-gu, Seoul 157-763 / KR | 06 /
Ahn, Byung Hwan Sinjukong APT. 315-104, Oe-dong Gimhae-si, Gyeongsangnam-do 621-754 / KR | 07 /
Jun, Chaseung 1405-406, Greenville Jugong 14 Danji, Choji-dong Danwon-gu, Ansan-si Gyeonggi-do, 425-876 / KR | 08 /
Min, Byoungwook Daerim APT. 101-904, Daebang-dong Dongjak-gu, Seoul 156-761 / KR | [2007/32] |
Former [2007/22] | 01 /
Choi, Seung Bong Sinwol-dong 44-9 Changwon-si, Gyeongsangnam-do 641-837 / KR | ||
02 /
Yoon, Sangheon Haan Jukong 9-Danji APT. 910-204 Gwangmyeong-si, Gyeonggi-do 423-761 / KR | |||
03 /
Park, Nungseo Woosung Apt. 106-206, Jayang-dong 579 Gwangjin-gu, Seoul 143-190 / KR | |||
04 /
Cho, Hung Myong Dongwon APT 102-302, Chojun-ri 558-2 Jillye-myeon Gimhae-si, Gyeongsangnam-do 621-884 / KR | |||
05 /
Han, Dae Yeong Jungkong APT. 3-Danji 302-1305, Deungchon 3-dong Gangseo-gu, Seoul 157-763 / KR | |||
06 /
Ahn, Byung Hwan Sinjukong APT. 315-104, Oe-dong Gimhae-si, Gyeongsangnam-do 621-754 / KR | |||
07 /
Jun, Chaseung Banpo-dong 726-29 Seocho-gu, Seoul 137-040 / KR | |||
08 /
Min, Byoungwook Daerim APT. 101-904, Daebang-dong Dongjak-gu, Seoul 156-761 / KR | Representative(s) | Urner, Peter Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/22] | Urner, Peter TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05808796.6 | 15.09.2005 | [2007/22] | WO2005KR03053 | Priority number, date | KR20040074093 | 16.09.2004 Original published format: KR 20040074093 | KR20040084416 | 21.10.2004 Original published format: KR 20040084416 | [2007/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006031066 | Date: | 23.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1788923 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 23.03.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A47L15/42 | [2007/22] | CPC: |
A47L15/4225 (EP,US);
A47L15/4221 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GESCHIRRSPÜLER | [2007/22] | English: | A DISHWASHER | [2007/22] | French: | LAVE-VAISSELLE | [2007/22] | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2006 | Search fee paid | 16.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.2006 | Examination requested [2007/22] | 22.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/03] | 26.08.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2014 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]JP2004049611 (ASAHI KOGYO CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4,7 * abstract * [A] 13,18-20 [Y] 3,5,6,8-12; | [Y]JPH11308793 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 3,10 * figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US3519796 (BEBINGER JACK E) [Y] 5,8,11 * figure 1 *; | [Y]EP0237994 (ZANUSSI ELETTRODOMESTICI [IT]) [Y] 6,9,12 * abstract *; | [XA]GB1406155 (TAPPAN CO) [X] 1,2,5,7,8 * figures 1-3; claim 1 * [A] 13,18-20; | [X]US3587939 (NYSTUEN ARNE M, et al) [X] 1,2,5,7,8 * figure 2; claims 1,8 *; | [A]US2004166001 (TURNER DWIGHT M [US], et al) [A] 13,14,17-20 * abstract *; | [A]US3375835 (LOPP CHARLES R, et al) [A] 13,14,17 * figure 1 *; | [A]US5333631 (KIRKLAND DANIEL R [US], et al) [A] 13,14 * figure 2 *; | [A]US2881777 (REMIGIUS PAULY) [A] 13,17 * figure 2 *; | [A]US2959179 (SASNETT RUSSELL M, et al) [A] 13 * figure 4 * | International search | [X]US3587939 (NYSTUEN ARNE M, et al); | [X]GB1406155 (TAPPAN CO); | [X]JP2004049611 (ASAHI KOGYO CO LTD); | [X]DE2328655 (TAPPAN CO); | [Y]JPH11308793 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]US3519796 (BEBINGER JACK E); | [A]DE2743826 (SKF KUGELLAGERFABRIKEN GMBH) |