|
27.05.2016 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.2016 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
18 |
|
26.04.2016 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.2016 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.2016 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.02.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
40 |
|
23.11.2015 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.11.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.10.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.10.2015 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
14.10.2015 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.02.2015 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.03.2014 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.03.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Appeal |
6 |
|
17.02.2012 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.01.2012 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.2012 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
29 |
|
23.01.2012 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
30 |
|
23.01.2012 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
30 |
|
14.10.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.10.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.10.2011 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.09.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.2011 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.2011 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.09.2011 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.09.2011 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.09.2011 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.2011 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.08.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.05.2011 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2011 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.03.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2011 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.11.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.11.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.09.2010 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.07.2010 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.02.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2010 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2007 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2007 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
27.09.2007 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
27.09.2007 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.09.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
25.07.2007 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2007 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.06.2007 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
14.06.2007 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.06.2007 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2007 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
18.05.2007 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2007 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
15.05.2007 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
20.04.2007 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.06.2006 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
15.06.2006 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
15.06.2006 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
45 |
|
15.06.2006 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
15.06.2006 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
83 |
|
31.05.2006 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
19.12.2005 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
19.12.2005 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
27 |
|
19.12.2005 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
48 |
|
19.12.2005 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
7 |