|
24.04.2017 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.04.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.04.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.04.2017 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
19 |
|
12.04.2017 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.04.2017 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.2017 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
26 |
|
14.03.2017 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.2017 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.2017 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
03.03.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.03.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.03.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.03.2017 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
29 |
|
06.02.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.02.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.02.2017 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.02.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.02.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
16.12.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.2016 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
8 |
|
12.08.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.07.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.07.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.07.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.07.2016 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.07.2016 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.07.2016 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.07.2016 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.10.2015 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.2013 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.2013 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.2013 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
21 |
|
23.08.2013 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.08.2013 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.08.2013 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.07.2013 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.04.2013 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.04.2013 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.04.2013 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
15.02.2013 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.02.2013 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.12.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.12.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2012 |
Annex |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.12.2012 |
Annex |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.12.2012 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
11.12.2012 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2012 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.12.2012 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
11.12.2012 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2012 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2012 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2012 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
20 |
|
10.08.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.08.2012 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2012 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.08.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.2012 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.04.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.2012 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.09.2011 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.07.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
15.07.2010 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.06.2010 |
Refusal of request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2010 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.05.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.2010 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.2010 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2009 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.2009 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
22 |
|
30.11.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
30.11.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
30.11.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
30.11.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.11.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
30.11.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
30.11.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
30.11.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
30.11.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
30.11.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
05.02.2009 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.01.2009 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2008 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.11.2008 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.11.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.08.2008 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.08.2008 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.08.2008 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2008 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
03.03.2008 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.03.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.03.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.10.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.10.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2007 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2007 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2007 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.2007 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.08.2007 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2007 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.07.2007 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
11.05.2007 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2007 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.05.2007 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.07.2006 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
21.07.2006 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
30.06.2006 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.06.2006 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
16.12.2005 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
16.12.2005 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
16.12.2005 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
18 |