EP1958231 - CORRECTIVE FOR ELIMINATING THE THIRD-ORDER APERTURE ABERRATION AND THE FIRST-ORDER, FIRST-DEGREE AXIAL CHROMATIC ABERRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.2019 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ceos Corrected Electron Optical Systems GmbH Englerstrasse 28 69125 Heidelberg / DE | [2008/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÜLLER, Heiko Häusserstrasse 33 69115 Heidelberg / DE | 02 /
ROSE, Harald Prinz-Christians-Weg 5a 64287 Darmstadt / DE | 03 /
UHLEMANN, Stephan Bahnhofstrasse 3 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [2008/43] |
Former [2008/34] | 01 /
MÜLLER, Heiko Ortenauer Str. 17 69126 Heidelberg / DE | ||
02 /
ROSE, Harald Prinz-Christians-Weg 5a 64287 Darmstadt / DE | |||
03 /
UHLEMANN, Stephan Bahnhofstrasse 3 69115 Heidelberg / DE | Representative(s) | Weber & Seidel Rechts- und Patentanwälte Handschuhsheimer Landstraße 2a 69120 Heidelberg / DE | [2012/40] |
Former [2011/20] | Weber, Walter Weber & Seidel Rechts- und Patentanwälte Handschuhsheimer Landstrasse 2a 69120 Heidelberg / DE | ||
Former [2008/34] | Pöhner, Wilfried Anton, Dr. Patentanwalt, Röntgenring 4 97070 Würzburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 05816963.2 | 06.12.2005 | [2008/34] | WO2005DE02210 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007065382 | Date: | 14.06.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1958231 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1958231 | Date: | 23.05.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/153, H01J37/26 | [2008/34] | CPC: |
H01J37/153 (EP,US);
H01J37/26 (EP,US);
H01J2237/1534 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/21] |
Former [2008/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KORREKTIV ZUR BESEITIGUNG DES ÖFFNUNGSFEHLERS 3. ORDNUNG UND DES AXIALEN FARBFEHLERS 1. ORDNUNG 1. GRADES | [2008/34] | English: | CORRECTIVE FOR ELIMINATING THE THIRD-ORDER APERTURE ABERRATION AND THE FIRST-ORDER, FIRST-DEGREE AXIAL CHROMATIC ABERRATION | [2008/34] | French: | CORRECTION D'ÉLIMINATION DE L'ERREUR D'OUVERTURE DE TROISIEME ORDRE ET DE L'ERREUR CHROMATIQUE AXIALE DE PREMIER ORDRE ET DU PREMIER DEGRE | [2008/34] | Entry into regional phase | 05.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 05.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/34] | 01.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 03.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 26.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/18] | Request for further processing for: | 30.03.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 30.03.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.04.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 03.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 16.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 17.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.12.2005 | CY | 23.05.2018 | DK | 23.05.2018 | EE | 23.05.2018 | ES | 23.05.2018 | FI | 23.05.2018 | IT | 23.05.2018 | LT | 23.05.2018 | LV | 23.05.2018 | MC | 23.05.2018 | PL | 23.05.2018 | PT | 23.05.2018 | RO | 23.05.2018 | SE | 23.05.2018 | SI | 23.05.2018 | SK | 23.05.2018 | TR | 23.05.2018 | BG | 23.08.2018 | GR | 24.08.2018 | IS | 23.09.2018 | AT | 06.12.2018 | IE | 06.12.2018 | LU | 06.12.2018 | BE | 31.12.2018 | CH | 31.12.2018 | FR | 31.12.2018 | LI | 31.12.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 06.12.2005 | |
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PT | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
TR | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
AT | 06.12.2018 | ||
IE | 06.12.2018 | ||
LU | 06.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | DK | 23.05.2018 | |
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PT | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
TR | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
AT | 06.12.2018 | ||
IE | 06.12.2018 | ||
LU | 06.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/23] | DK | 23.05.2018 | |
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
TR | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
AT | 06.12.2018 | ||
IE | 06.12.2018 | ||
LU | 06.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | DK | 23.05.2018 | |
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
TR | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
IE | 06.12.2018 | ||
LU | 06.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/04] | DK | 23.05.2018 | |
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
IE | 06.12.2018 | ||
LU | 06.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | DK | 23.05.2018 | |
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
IE | 06.12.2018 | ||
LU | 06.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/49] | DK | 23.05.2018 | |
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
IE | 06.12.2018 | ||
LU | 06.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 23.05.2018 | |
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
IE | 06.12.2018 | ||
LU | 06.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | DK | 23.05.2018 | |
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
LU | 06.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/39] | DK | 23.05.2018 | |
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
LU | 06.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | DK | 23.05.2018 | |
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | DK | 23.05.2018 | |
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | DK | 23.05.2018 | |
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 23.05.2018 | |
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 23.05.2018 | |
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | ES | 23.05.2018 | |
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | ES | 23.05.2018 | |
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | ES | 23.05.2018 | |
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 23.05.2018 | |
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2003034457 (ROSE HARALD [DE]) [Y] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1381073 (NION CO [US]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] , [0016] - [0018] - [0020] , [0023] - [0025] * * claim - ** figure - *; | [DA]US2004155200 (MULLER HEIKO [DE], et al) [DA] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2005023480 (ROSE HARALD [DE]) [Y] 1-13 * the whole document * |