EP1807724 - OPTICALLY ENHANCED DIGITAL IMAGING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.07.2012 [2012/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cascade Microtech, Inc. 2430 NW 206th Avenue Beaverton, OR 97006 / US | [2007/40] |
Former [2007/29] | For all designated states Umech Technologies Co. 25 Clarendon Street Watertown, MA 02472 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABNET, Cameron 164 Grove Street Waltham, MA 02453 / US | 02 /
FELDKHUN, Daniel, Leibovich 71 Benthaven Place Boulder, CO 80305 / US | 03 /
MERMELSTEIN, Michael, Stephen 48A Robert Road Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | [2007/29] | Representative(s) | Beyer, Andreas, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/29] | Beyer, Andreas, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05817014.3 | 31.10.2005 | [2007/29] | WO2005US39561 | Priority number, date | US20040624326P | 02.11.2004 Original published format: US 624326 P | [2007/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006050395 | Date: | 11.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1807724 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G02B21/02, G02B21/36, G06T3/00 | [2007/29] | CPC: |
G06T3/4069 (EP,US);
G02B21/025 (EP,US);
G02B21/18 (EP,US);
G02B21/365 (EP,US);
H04N1/393 (EP,US);
H04N23/69 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/48] |
Former [2007/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCH ERWEITERTES DIGITALES BILDGEBUNGSSYSTEM | [2007/29] | English: | OPTICALLY ENHANCED DIGITAL IMAGING SYSTEM | [2007/29] | French: | SYSTEME D'IMAGERIE NUMERIQUE OPTIQUEMENT AMELIORE | [2007/29] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/29] | 09.07.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 18.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/29] | 28.02.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/29] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.09.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5686960 (SUSSMAN MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-15,18-20 * column 12, line 10 - column 13, line 67; figures 9-13 *; | [Y]US2002176160 (SUZUKI AKITOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-15,18-20 * paragraphs [0010] - [0012] - [0044] - [0057] - [0066] - [0072] - [0104] - [0110]; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US2003076585 (LEDLEY ROBERT S [US]) [Y] 1-15,18-20 * paragraphs [0006] , [0020] , [0033]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2004170312 (SOENKSEN DIRK G [US]) [A] 1-15,18-20* paragraphs [0050] , [0071] , [0072]; figures 2,5a,5b * |