EP1810492 - MESSAGING SERVICE IN A PAIR TO PAIR TYPE TELECOMMUNICATIONS NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Orange 78, rue Olivier de Serres 75015 Paris / FR | [2013/39] |
Former [2009/17] | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6 Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/30] | For all designated states France Telecom S.A. 6, Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BABAGBETO, Patrick 120 Rue des Plages F-22560 TREBEURDEN / FR | 02 /
NEVEUX, Didier 17 Rue Jean Monnet F-22140 CAVAN / FR | 03 /
DEBEAU, Eric Impasse Hingard Huellan F-22300 LANNION / FR | [2007/30] | Representative(s) | Delumeau, François Guy, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Delumeau, François Guy, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2007/30] | Delumeau, François Guy, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75007 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 05819238.6 | 03.11.2005 | [2007/30] | WO2005FR50924 | Priority number, date | FR20040011860 | 08.11.2004 Original published format: FR 0411860 | [2007/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006051232 | Date: | 18.05.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1810492 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1810492 | Date: | 03.01.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/53 | [2007/30] | CPC: |
H04L67/104 (EP,US);
H04L51/00 (EP,US);
H04L67/1061 (EP,US);
H04M3/533 (EP,US);
H04M3/537 (EP,US);
H04L51/224 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/01] |
Former [2007/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | NACHRICHTENÜBERTRAGUNG ÜBER EIN PEER-TO-PEER TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSNETZWERK | [2017/27] | English: | MESSAGING SERVICE IN A PAIR TO PAIR TYPE TELECOMMUNICATIONS NETWORK | [2007/30] | French: | SERVICE DE MESSAGERIE DANS UN RESEAU DE TELECOMMUNICATIONS DE TYPE "PAIR A PAIR" | [2007/30] |
Former [2007/30] | NACHRICHTENÜBERMITTLUNGSDIENST IN PEER-TO-PEER-TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSNETZEN | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/30] | 10.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 22.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2011 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   21.02.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.11.2005 | AT | 03.01.2018 | CY | 03.01.2018 | CZ | 03.01.2018 | DK | 03.01.2018 | EE | 03.01.2018 | ES | 03.01.2018 | FI | 03.01.2018 | IT | 03.01.2018 | LT | 03.01.2018 | LV | 03.01.2018 | MC | 03.01.2018 | NL | 03.01.2018 | PL | 03.01.2018 | PT | 03.01.2018 | RO | 03.01.2018 | SE | 03.01.2018 | SI | 03.01.2018 | SK | 03.01.2018 | TR | 03.01.2018 | BG | 03.04.2018 | GR | 04.04.2018 | IS | 03.05.2018 | [2020/30] |
Former [2020/27] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PT | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
TR | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
TR | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 03.01.2018 | |
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 03.01.2018 | |
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 03.01.2018 | |
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 03.01.2018 | |
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0760573 (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1-16 * page 2, column R, line 7 - page 3, column L, line 53 * * page 4, column R, line 10 - page 11, column L, line 50 *; | [YA]FR2838011 (FRANCE TELECOM [FR]) [Y] 1,6,9,10,13-15 * page 1, line 1 - page 4, line 2 * * page 5, line 9 - page 13, line 3 * [A] 2-5,7,8,11,12,16; | [A]US2004064512 (ARORA AKHIL K [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [YA] - JULIEN REYNIER, "Projet: ce que vous devez savoir avant de fabriquer un réseau de partage Peer to Peer", INTERNET, (20040607), URL: http://www.di.ens.fr/~jreynier/Recherche/Projet%20P2P.pdf, (20060220), XP002368861 [Y] 1,6,9,10,13-15 * page 4, line 7 - page 4, line 41 * * page 8, line 20 - page 10, line 4 * * page 11, line 26 - page 12, line 30 * [A] 2-5,7,8,11,12,16 | [DA] - BRAM COHEM, "Incentives Build Robustness in BitTorrent", INET. ANNUAL INTERNET SOCIETY CONFERENCE, XX, XX, (20030522), pages 1 - 5, XP002334200 [DA] 1-16 * the whole document * |