EP1828680 - REACTOR DESIGN TO REDUCE PARTICLE DEPOSITION DURING EFFLUENT ABATEMENT PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/36] | REACTOR DESIGN TO REDUCE PARTICLE DEPOSITION DURING PROCESS ABATEMENT | ||
[2011/36] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.12.2012 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.01.2013 [2013/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2012/05] |
Former [2007/36] | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHIU, Ho-Man, Rodney 1776 Wayne Circle San Jose, CA 95131 / US | 02 /
CLARK, Daniel, O. 3657 Locke Court Pleasanton, CA 94566 / US | 03 /
CRAWFORD, Shaun, W. 2827 Yarmouth Way San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | 04 /
JUNG, Jay, J. 1068 Darrungton Court Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | 05 /
TODD, Leonard, B. 69 Belvedere Ct Napa, CA 94559 / US | 06 /
VERMEULEN, Robbert 77 Byron Drive Pleasant Hill, CA 96523 / US | [2007/36] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann, Gerd Heinrich, et al Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/36] | Zimmermann, Gerd Heinrich, et al Zimmermann & Partner, P.O. Box 330 920 80069 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05820049.4 | 12.11.2005 | [2007/36] | WO2005US40960 | Priority number, date | US20040987921 | 12.11.2004 Original published format: US 987921 | [2007/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006053231 | Date: | 18.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1828680 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1828680 | Date: | 01.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F23G7/06, F23M5/08, F23J9/00 | [2007/36] | CPC: |
F23M5/085 (EP,US);
F23G7/06 (KR);
F23G7/065 (EP,US);
F23J9/00 (EP,KR,US);
F23M5/08 (KR);
F23D2900/00016 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, IT [2007/51] |
Former [2007/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | REAKTORAUSFÜHRUNG ZUR VERRINGERUNG DER TEILCHENABLAGERUNG BEI AUSSTOSSVERMINDERUNGSPROZESS | [2011/36] | English: | REACTOR DESIGN TO REDUCE PARTICLE DEPOSITION DURING EFFLUENT ABATEMENT PROCESS | [2011/36] | French: | CONCEPTION D'UN RÉACTEUR RÉDUISANT LES DÉPÔTS DE PARTICULES DANS UN PROCÉDÉ DE RÉDUCTION DES EFFLUENTS | [2011/36] |
Former [2007/36] | REAKTORAUSFÜHRUNG ZUR VERRINGERUNG DER TEILCHENABLAGERUNG BEI PROZESSMINDERUNG | ||
Former [2007/36] | REACTOR DESIGN TO REDUCE PARTICLE DEPOSITION DURING PROCESS ABATEMENT | ||
Former [2007/36] | CONCEPTION D'UN REACTEUR REDUISANT LE DEPOT DE PARTICULES PENDANT LE PROCESSUS DE REDUCTION | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/36] | 12.06.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.08.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 17.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.12.2010 | Opposition(s) | 05.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 01.02.2012 | [2012/50] | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH09133333 ; | [A]JPH02225905 ; | [A]JPH06313532 ; | [A]JP2001082723 ; | [A]US4392821 (FUESSL ERWIN [CH], et al) [A] 1,42,57 * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 15 * * column 3, line 26 - line 35 *; | [XY]EP0694735 (ALZETA CORP [US]) [X] 37,41 * column 1, line 3 - line 22 * * column 4, line 13 - line 28 * * column 6, line 14 - line 29 * * column 6, line 46 - column 7, line 7; figure 3 * [Y] 1-10,13-29,31-33,35,36,38-40,42-61; | [A]EP0802370 (BOC GROUP PLC [GB]) [A] 1,42,57 * page 3, line 18 - line 42; figure 1 *; | [Y]EP0809071 (BURNER SYSTEMS INT [US]) [Y] 14,15 * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 17 * * column 15, line 1 - line 15 *; | [A]US6234787 (ENDOH FUMITAKA [JP], et al) [A] 1,28,29,42,53,54,57 * column 1, line 6 - line 13 * * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 9 * * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 24 * * column 9, line 22 - line 28 *; | [YA]EP1143197 (EBARA CORP [JP]) [Y] 8,9 * paragraphs [0032] - [0034] - [0060] , [0090] , [0091]; figures 17,18 * [A] 1,42,57; | [Y]EP1431657 (AEROMATIX LTD [GB]) [Y] 13 * paragraphs [0004] , [0005]; figure 6 *; | [Y]US2004161718 (PETTIT WILLIAM H [US]) [Y] 16,17,35,36,38-40,49,50 * paragraph [0028]; figure 1 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970930), vol. 1997, no. 09, & JP09133333 A 19970520 (MAROO ZOKEI KK) [Y] 1-10,13-29,31-33,35,36,38-40,42-61 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901127), vol. 014, no. 536, Database accession no. (M - 1052), & JP02225905 A 19900907 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1,42,57 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950331), vol. 1995, no. 02, & JP06313532 A 19941108 (SHINAGAWA REFRACT CO LTD) [A] 1,42,57 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010710), vol. 2000, no. 20, & JP2001082723 A 20010330 (NIPPON SANSO CORP) [A] 1,42,57 * abstract * |