EP1817607 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR LOCATION DETERMINATION OF A WIRELESS DEVICE WITHIN AN ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.04.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2018/20] |
Former [2007/33] | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHOTTEN, Hans Dieter Dr. Carlo-Schmid-Str. 180 90491 Nuremberg / DE | 02 /
FISCHER, Sven Rollner Str. 134 90408 Nuernberg / DE | [2018/20] |
Former [2007/33] | 01 /
SCHOTTEN, Hans Dieter Dr. Carlo-Schmid-Str. 180 90491 Nuremberg / DE | ||
02 /
FISCHER, Sven Rollnerstr 134 90408 Nuernberg / DE | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/20] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2009/48] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2007/33] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street GB-London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05849246.3 | 22.11.2005 | [2007/33] | WO2005US42529 | Priority number, date | US20040630819P | 24.11.2004 Original published format: US 630819 P | US20050245926 | 07.10.2005 Original published format: US 245926 | [2007/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006058112 | Date: | 01.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1817607 | Date: | 15.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1817607 | Date: | 16.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/725, G01S5/02, // H04W64/00 | [2017/04] | CPC: |
H04W64/00 (EP,US);
G01S1/68 (EP,KR,US);
H04M1/72412 (EP,KR,US);
H04M1/72457 (EP,KR,US);
H04W64/003 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2007/33] | G01S5/02, H04M1/725, H04Q7/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/20] |
Former [2007/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR STANDORTERMITTLUNG EINER DRAHTLOSEN VORRICHTUNG INNERHALB EINER UMGEBUNG | [2007/33] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR LOCATION DETERMINATION OF A WIRELESS DEVICE WITHIN AN ENVIRONMENT | [2007/33] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE DETERMINER LA LOCALISATION D'UN DISPOSITIF SANS FIL DANS UN ENVIRONNEMENT | [2007/33] | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/33] | 14.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 19.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.04.2018 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 05.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP14197429.5 / EP2889637 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.02.2008 | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 06.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 07.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 07.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.11.2005 | AT | 16.05.2018 | CY | 16.05.2018 | CZ | 16.05.2018 | DK | 16.05.2018 | EE | 16.05.2018 | ES | 16.05.2018 | FI | 16.05.2018 | IT | 16.05.2018 | LT | 16.05.2018 | LV | 16.05.2018 | MC | 16.05.2018 | NL | 16.05.2018 | PL | 16.05.2018 | PT | 16.05.2018 | RO | 16.05.2018 | SE | 16.05.2018 | SI | 16.05.2018 | SK | 16.05.2018 | TR | 16.05.2018 | BG | 16.08.2018 | GR | 17.08.2018 | IS | 16.09.2018 | IE | 22.11.2018 | LU | 22.11.2018 | BE | 30.11.2018 | CH | 30.11.2018 | LI | 30.11.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 22.11.2005 | |
AT | 16.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
IT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PT | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
TR | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
IE | 22.11.2018 | ||
LU | 22.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
IT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PT | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
TR | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
IE | 22.11.2018 | ||
LU | 22.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
IT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
TR | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
IE | 22.11.2018 | ||
LU | 22.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
IT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
IE | 22.11.2018 | ||
LU | 22.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
IT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
IE | 22.11.2018 | ||
LU | 22.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
IT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
LU | 22.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
IT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
LU | 22.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
IT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
IT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
IT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 16.05.2018 | |
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 16.05.2018 | |
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | ES | 16.05.2018 | |
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | ES | 16.05.2018 | |
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | ES | 16.05.2018 | |
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 16.05.2018 | |
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9955102 (NETLINE COMMUNICATIONS TECHNOL [IL], et al) [X] 1-36* Summary of the invention *; | [X]EP1313079 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [X] 1-4,7,8,10-13,16,17,19-22,25,26,28-31,34,35 * paragraphs [0012] , [0013] , [0023] , [0026] * * paragraphs [0034] - [0036] *; | [X]WO2004040923 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [X] 1-36 * abstract * * page 5, line 9 - line 15 * * page 8, line 3 - page 9, column 7 * * page 9, line 11 - line 17 * * page 11, line 17 - page 13, line 8 * * page 13, line 20 - page 14, line 5 * * page 12, line 19 - page 13, line 4 * * page 24 * * figure 1 *; | [X]WO2004057361 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-36 * the whole document *; | [X]US2004203944 (HUOMO HEIKKI [FI], et al) [X] 1-4,6-13,15-22,24-31,33-36 * abstract * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0050] * | by applicant | WO2004040923 |