EP1806896 - Method of selecting and presenting supplementary information [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.05.2008 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.06.2008 [2008/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HURRA Communications GmbH Wollgrasweg 27 70599 Stuttgart / DE | [2007/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schweier, René Weidenrösdenweg 23 70599 Stuttgart / DE | [2007/28] | Representative(s) | Wörz, Volker Alfred Dreiss Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedrichstrasse 6 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/28] | Wörz, Volker Alfred Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker, Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 06000350.6 | 10.01.2006 | [2007/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1806896 | Date: | 11.07.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2007/28] | CPC: |
G06Q30/00 (EP);
H04L67/306 (EP);
H04L67/535 (EP);
H04L67/75 (EP);
H04L69/329 (EP);
H04M3/4878 (EP);
H04N21/23424 (EP);
H04N21/25891 (EP);
H04N21/44213 (EP);
H04N21/4532 (EP);
H04N21/47815 (EP);
H04M3/42068 (EP);
H04M3/4211 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/12] |
Former [2007/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Auswahl und Darstellung einer Zusatzinformation | [2007/28] | English: | Method of selecting and presenting supplementary information | [2007/28] | French: | Procédé de sélection et présentation d'une information supplémentaire | [2007/28] | Examination procedure | 18.01.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/28] | 13.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/26] | 29.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/26] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2001023436 (SRINIVASAN ANAND [US], et al) [X] 1-9,11-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0082] * * paragraph [0107] * * paragraph [0123] - paragraph [0126] * * paragraph [0184] - paragraph [0230] *; | [X]US2002178447 (PLOTNICK MICHAEL A [US], et al) [X] 1-9,11-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0085] * * paragraph [0088] - paragraph [0089] * * paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0093] * * paragraph [0101] * * paragraph [0109] - paragraph [0112] * * paragraph [0123] - paragraph [0124] * * paragraph [0129] - paragraph [0130] *; | [X]WO2004057850 (LOOKATEL B V [NL], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6,7,9-15 * page 1, line 10 - line 33 * * page 5, line 11 - page 8, line 21 *; | [X]US6857024 (CHEN MICHAEL C [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6,9-15 * abstract * * column 1, line 23 - column 2, line 7 * * column 3, line 33 - column 6, line 20 * * column 13, line 51 - column 15, line 27 ** column 17, line 41 - line 52 *; | [X]US2005097599 (PLOTNICK MICHAEL A [US], et al) [X] 1-9,11-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0090] * * paragraph [0109] * * paragraph [0121] - paragraph [0142] * * paragraph [0151] - paragraph [0158] * * paragraph [0163] - paragraph [0174] * * paragraph [0189] - paragraph [0196] * |