blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1710435

EP1710435 - Refrigerant compressor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  05.05.2023
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.11.2023Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: GR
published on 13.12.2023  [2023/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BITZER Kühlmaschinenbau GmbH
Peter-Schaufler-Platz 1
71065 Sindelfingen / DE
[2019/43]
Former [2006/41]For all designated states
Bitzer Kühlmaschinenbau GmbH
Eschenbrünnlestrasse 15
71065 Sindelfingen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Sandkötter, Wolfgang
Nebelhornstrasse 31
71803 Herrenberg / DE
 [2006/41]
Representative(s)Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
[2023/23]
Former [2006/41]Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte
Uhlandstrasse 14 c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date06005929.223.03.2006
[2006/41]
Priority number, dateDE2005101643305.04.2005         Original published format: DE102005016433
[2006/41]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1710435
Date:11.10.2006
Language:DE
[2006/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1710435
Date:22.08.2007
Language:DE
[2007/34]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1710435
Date:07.06.2023
Language:DE
[2023/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.06.2006
ClassificationIPC:F04B49/03, // F04B27/053
[2006/41]
CPC:
F04B49/225 (EP,US); F04B27/053 (EP); F04B27/067 (EP);
F04B27/24 (EP); F04B35/01 (EP); F04B7/0076 (EP);
F25B41/22 (EP,US); F04B2201/06011 (EP,US); F25B2600/2515 (EP,US);
F25B2600/2521 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2023/23]
Former [2006/41]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Kältemittelverdichter[2006/41]
English:Refrigerant compressor[2006/41]
French:Compresseur de réfrigérant[2006/41]
Examination procedure24.11.2006Examination requested  [2007/02]
22.12.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.01.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.03.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.07.2007Fee for grant paid
10.07.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.05.2008  30.05.2008  ADMISSIBLE
Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc.
1675 W. Campbell Road
Sidney, OH 45365-0669 / US
Opponent's representative
J A Kemp LLP, et al, et al
80 Turnmill Street
London EC1M 5QU / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2017/29]
Opponent(s)01  23.05.2008  30.05.2008  ADMISSIBLE
Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc.
1675 W. Campbell Road
Sidney, OH 45365-0669 / US
Opponent's representative
J A Kemp, et al, et al
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [2008/27]
Opponent(s)01  23.05.2008   
Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc.
1675 W. Campbell Road
Sidney, OH 45365-0669 / US
Opponent's representative
Merryweather, Colin Henry, et al, et al
J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
30.06.2008Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
06.02.2009Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
16.02.2009Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
09.04.2009Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
15.12.2010Date of oral proceedings
03.03.2011Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
21.10.2014Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06)
29.04.2015Reply to a communication from the opposition division
24.01.2017Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 02.05.2017
02.05.2017Date of oral proceedings
27.11.2017Date of oral proceedings
08.05.2018Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
08.05.2018Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
21.01.2022Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
14.02.2022Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
27.02.2023Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
03.05.2023Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition26.06.2018Appeal received No.  T1647/18
22.08.2018Statement of grounds filed
21.01.2022Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
14.02.2022Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal
03.05.2011Appeal received No.  T0966/11
05.07.2011Statement of grounds filed
13.11.2013Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
31.01.2014Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal
13.11.2013Date of oral proceedings
22.11.2013Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
21.01.2022Date of oral proceedings
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY22.08.2007
EE22.08.2007
LT22.08.2007
LV22.08.2007
IS22.12.2007
MC31.03.2008
AT23.03.2009
CZ23.03.2009
FI23.03.2009
LU23.03.2009
RO23.03.2009
HU24.03.2009
SE24.03.2009
SI24.03.2009
BE31.03.2009
PT23.09.2009
NL01.10.2009
IE23.03.2010
PL23.03.2010
SK23.03.2010
CH31.03.2010
DK31.03.2010
LI31.03.2010
BG08.08.2017
[2023/50]
Former [2019/10]CY22.08.2007
EE22.08.2007
LT22.08.2007
LV22.08.2007
IS22.12.2007
MC31.03.2008
AT23.03.2009
CZ23.03.2009
FI23.03.2009
LU23.03.2009
RO23.03.2009
HU24.03.2009
SE24.03.2009
SI24.03.2009
BE31.03.2009
PT23.09.2009
NL01.10.2009
IE23.03.2010
PL23.03.2010
SK23.03.2010
CH31.03.2010
DK31.03.2010
LI31.03.2010
GR04.10.2010
BG08.08.2017
Former [2017/37]CY22.08.2007
EE22.08.2007
LT22.08.2007
LV22.08.2007
IS22.12.2007
MC31.03.2008
AT23.03.2009
CZ23.03.2009
FI23.03.2009
LU23.03.2009
RO23.03.2009
HU24.03.2009
SE24.03.2009
SI24.03.2009
BE31.03.2009
BG31.03.2009
PT23.09.2009
NL01.10.2009
IE23.03.2010
PL23.03.2010
SK23.03.2010
CH31.03.2010
DK31.03.2010
LI31.03.2010
GR04.10.2010
Former [2017/13]CY22.08.2007
EE22.08.2007
LT22.08.2007
LV22.08.2007
IS22.12.2007
MC31.03.2008
AT23.03.2009
CZ23.03.2009
FI23.03.2009
LU23.03.2009
RO23.03.2009
HU24.03.2009
SE24.03.2009
SI24.03.2009
BE31.03.2009
BG31.03.2009
PT23.09.2009
NL01.10.2009
IE23.03.2010
PL23.03.2010
SK23.03.2010
CH31.03.2010
DK31.03.2010
LI31.03.2010
GR04.10.2010
IT23.03.2016
Former [2015/22]CY22.08.2007
EE22.08.2007
LT22.08.2007
LV22.08.2007
IS22.12.2007
MC31.03.2008
AT23.03.2009
CZ23.03.2009
FI23.03.2009
LU23.03.2009
RO23.03.2009
HU24.03.2009
SE24.03.2009
SI24.03.2009
BE31.03.2009
BG31.03.2009
PT23.09.2009
NL01.10.2009
IE23.03.2010
PL23.03.2010
SK23.03.2010
CH31.03.2010
DK31.03.2010
LI31.03.2010
GR04.10.2010
Former [2011/32]CY22.08.2007
EE22.08.2007
LT22.08.2007
LV22.08.2007
IS22.12.2007
MC31.03.2008
AT23.03.2009
CZ23.03.2009
FI23.03.2009
LU23.03.2009
RO23.03.2009
HU24.03.2009
SE24.03.2009
SI24.03.2009
BE31.03.2009
BG31.03.2009
PT23.09.2009
NL01.10.2009
IE23.03.2010
SK23.03.2010
CH31.03.2010
DK31.03.2010
LI31.03.2010
GR04.10.2010
Former [2011/22]CY22.08.2007
EE22.08.2007
LT22.08.2007
LV22.08.2007
IS22.12.2007
MC31.03.2008
AT23.03.2009
CZ23.03.2009
FI23.03.2009
LU23.03.2009
RO23.03.2009
HU24.03.2009
SI24.03.2009
BE31.03.2009
BG31.03.2009
PT23.09.2009
NL01.10.2009
IE23.03.2010
SK23.03.2010
CH31.03.2010
DK31.03.2010
LI31.03.2010
GR04.10.2010
Former [2011/19]CY22.08.2007
EE22.08.2007
LT22.08.2007
LV22.08.2007
IS22.12.2007
MC31.03.2008
AT23.03.2009
CZ23.03.2009
FI23.03.2009
RO23.03.2009
HU24.03.2009
SI24.03.2009
BE31.03.2009
BG31.03.2009
PT23.09.2009
NL01.10.2009
IE23.03.2010
SK23.03.2010
CH31.03.2010
DK31.03.2010
LI31.03.2010
GR04.10.2010
Former [2011/16]CY22.08.2007
EE22.08.2007
LT22.08.2007
LV22.08.2007
IS22.12.2007
MC31.03.2008
AT23.03.2009
CZ23.03.2009
FI23.03.2009
RO23.03.2009
HU24.03.2009
SI24.03.2009
BE31.03.2009
BG31.03.2009
PT23.09.2009
NL01.10.2009
IE23.03.2010
SK23.03.2010
CH31.03.2010
LI31.03.2010
GR04.10.2010
Former [2011/12]CY22.08.2007
EE22.08.2007
LT22.08.2007
LV22.08.2007
IS22.12.2007
MC31.03.2008
AT23.03.2009
CZ23.03.2009
FI23.03.2009
RO23.03.2009
HU24.03.2009
SI24.03.2009
BE31.03.2009
PT23.09.2009
NL01.10.2009
IE23.03.2010
SK23.03.2010
CH31.03.2010
LI31.03.2010
Former [2011/08]CY22.08.2007
EE22.08.2007
LT22.08.2007
LV22.08.2007
IS22.12.2007
MC31.03.2008
AT23.03.2009
CZ23.03.2009
FI23.03.2009
RO23.03.2009
HU24.03.2009
SI24.03.2009
BE31.03.2009
PT23.09.2009
NL01.10.2009
IE23.03.2010
Former [2010/13]CY22.08.2007
EE22.08.2007
LT22.08.2007
LV22.08.2007
IS22.12.2007
MC31.03.2008
AT23.03.2009
CZ23.03.2009
FI23.03.2009
RO23.03.2009
HU24.03.2009
SI24.03.2009
BE31.03.2009
PT23.09.2009
NL01.10.2009
Former [2010/01]CY22.08.2007
EE22.08.2007
LT22.08.2007
LV22.08.2007
IS22.12.2007
MC31.03.2008
AT23.03.2009
CZ23.03.2009
FI23.03.2009
PT23.09.2009
Former [2009/11]EE22.08.2007
LT22.08.2007
LV22.08.2007
IS22.12.2007
MC31.03.2008
Former [2008/46]LT22.08.2007
LV22.08.2007
IS22.12.2007
MC31.03.2008
Former [2008/17]LT22.08.2007
LV22.08.2007
IS22.12.2007
Former [2008/12]LT22.08.2007
IS22.12.2007
Former [2008/07]LT22.08.2007
Documents cited:Search[A]DE4212162  (ILKA MASCHINENFABRIK HALLE GMB [DE]) [A] 1* column 2, line 9 - column 2, line 45 *;
 [A]US5540061  (GOMMORI MASAHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-23 * abstract *;
 [A]US2001011463  (POLLRICH VOLKER [DE], et al) [A] 1-23 * paragraphs [0110] - [0120]; figures 1,15 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.