EP1702586 - Expandable medical device with ductile hinges [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Conor Medsystems, Inc. 1003 Hamilton Court Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2006/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shanley, John, F. 217 Yarborough Lane Redwood City, CA 94061 / US | [2008/08] |
Former [2006/38] | 01 /
Shanley, John, F. 217 Yarborough Lane Redwood City CA 94061 / US | Representative(s) | Schorr, Frank Jürgen, et al Diehl & Partner GbR Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/38] | Schorr, Frank Jürgen, et al Diehl & Partner, Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06006253.6 | 26.03.1999 | [2006/38] | Priority number, date | US19980079881P | 30.03.1998 Original published format: US 79881 P | US19980183555 | 29.10.1998 Original published format: US 183555 | [2006/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1702586 | Date: | 20.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1702586 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/82 | [2008/02] | CPC: |
A61F2/91 (EP);
A61F2/915 (EP);
A61F2002/91541 (EP);
A61F2002/91558 (EP);
A61F2250/0018 (EP);
A61F2250/0029 (EP);
A61F2250/0036 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/38] | A61F2/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2006/38] | Title | German: | Biegsame medizinische Vorrichtung | [2006/38] | English: | Expandable medical device with ductile hinges | [2006/38] | French: | Dispositif médical flexible | [2006/38] | Examination procedure | 27.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/38] | 25.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99914186.4 / EP1071490 | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.08.2008 | CY | 06.08.2008 | DK | 06.08.2008 | FI | 06.08.2008 | SE | 06.11.2008 | GR | 07.11.2008 | ES | 17.11.2008 | PT | 06.01.2009 | LU | 26.03.2009 | CH | 31.03.2009 | LI | 31.03.2009 | MC | 31.03.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/22] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SE | 06.11.2008 | ||
GR | 07.11.2008 | ||
ES | 17.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
LU | 26.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2011/02] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SE | 06.11.2008 | ||
GR | 07.11.2008 | ||
ES | 17.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/13] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SE | 06.11.2008 | ||
ES | 17.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
ES | 17.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/28] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
ES | 17.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
ES | 17.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
ES | 17.11.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5449373 (PINCHASIK GREGORY [IL], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9526695 (PROGRAFT MEDICAL INC [US], et al) [A] 1-12* abstract *; | [A]WO9732544 (DIVYSIO SOLUTIONS LTD [CA], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * |