blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1734730

EP1734730 - Device and method for displaying files during bluetooth communication in a wireless terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  17.07.2015
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2015Refusal of applicationpublished on 19.08.2015  [2015/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR
[2012/38]
Former [2006/51]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
416 Maetan-Dong Yeongtong-Gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-Do / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Park, Seung-Kwon
c/oSamsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong
Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR
02 / Suk, Ji-Won
c/oSamsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong
Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR
03 / Choi, Seung-Chul
c/oSamsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong
Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2006/51]
Representative(s)Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
[2013/28]
Former [2012/11]Hutter, Jacobus Johannes, et al
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
J.W. Frisolaan 13
2517 JS The Hague / NL
Former [2006/51]Lang, Johannes
Bardehle Pagenberg Dost Altenburg Geissler, Postfach 86 06 20
81633 München / DE
Application number, filing date06007043.003.04.2006
[2006/51]
Priority number, dateKR2005002843106.04.2005         Original published format: KR 20050028431
[2006/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1734730
Date:20.12.2006
Language:EN
[2006/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.11.2006
ClassificationIPC:H04M1/725, H04M1/247
[2006/51]
CPC:
H04L67/06 (EP,US); H04B1/40 (KR); H04M1/72469 (EP,US);
H04M1/72412 (EP,US); H04M2250/02 (EP,US); H04W84/18 (EP,US);
H04W88/02 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL,   SE [2007/35]
Former [2006/51]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Anzeigen von Dateien während einer Bluetooth-Kommunikationsverbindung in einem drahtlosen Endgerät[2006/51]
English:Device and method for displaying files during bluetooth communication in a wireless terminal[2006/51]
French:Dispositif et procédé d'affichage de fichiers pendant une communication Bluetooth dans un terminal sans fil[2006/51]
Examination procedure03.04.2006Examination requested  [2006/51]
28.06.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.09.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.11.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.05.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.02.2011Date of oral proceedings
13.04.2011Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2015/34]
13.04.2011Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
22.04.2015Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/34]
Appeal following examination09.05.2011Appeal received No.  T2041/11
23.08.2011Statement of grounds filed
22.04.2015Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
22.04.2015Date of oral proceedings
29.04.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.06.2007
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
16.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
25.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
20.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
30.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
29.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
26.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
31.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]JP2002345039  (SONY CORP) [X] 1-16 * abstract ** paragraph [0065]; figures 2,6 *;
 [X]WO03033209  (NOKIA INC [US]) [X] 1-16 * paragraphs [0047] , [0055] - [0063] * * figures 1,8,9,13,14 *;
 [X]  - "Part K:12 - File Transfer Profile", SPECIFICATION OF THE BLUETOOTH SYSTEM - PROFILES - VERSION 1.1, (20010222), pages 365 - 396, XP002405904 [X] 1-16 * Sections 2.2, 2.3, 4.2-4.4 *
by applicantJP2002345039
 WO03033209
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.