EP1724751 - Liquid crystal display device and electronic apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.02.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd. 398 Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP | [2013/15] |
Former [2006/47] | For all designated states SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LABORATORY CO., LTD. 398 Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamazaki, Shunpei c/o Semiconductor Energy Lab. Co., Ltd. 398, Hase Atsugi-shi Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP | 02 /
Koyama, Jun c/o Semiconductor Energy Lab. Co., Ltd. 398, Hase Atsugi-shi Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP | 03 /
Tanada, Yoshifumi c/o Semiconductor Energy Lab. Co., Ltd. 398, Hase Atsugi-shi Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP | 04 /
Osame, Mitsuaki c/o Semiconductor Energy Lab. Co., Ltd. 398, Hase Atsugi-shi Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP | 05 /
Kimura, Hajime c/o Semiconductor Energy Lab. Co., Ltd. 398, Hase Atsugi-shi Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP | 06 /
Fukumoto, Ryota c/o Semiconductor Energy Lab. Co., Ltd. 398, Hase Atsugi-shi Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP | 07 /
Yanai, Hiromi c/o Semiconductor Energy Lab. Co., Ltd. 398, Hase Atsugi-shi Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP | [2013/15] |
Former [2006/47] | 01 /
Yamazaki, Shunpei c/o Semiconductor Energy Lab. Co., Ltd. 398, Hase Atsugi-shi Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP | ||
02 /
Koyama, Jun c/o Semiconductor Energy Lab. Co., Ltd. 398, Hase Atsugi-shi Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP | |||
03 /
Tanada, Yoshifumi c/o Semiconductor Energy Lab. Co., Ltd. 398, Hase Atsugi-shi Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP | |||
04 /
Osame, Mitsuaki c/o Semiconductor Energy Lab. Co., Ltd. 398, Hase Atsugi-shi Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP | |||
05 /
Kimura, Hajime c/o Semiconductor Energy Lab. Co., Ltd. 398, Hase Atsugi-shi Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP | |||
06 /
Fukumoto, Ryota c/o Semiconductor Energy Lab. Co., Ltd. 398, Hase Atsugi-shi Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP | |||
07 /
Yanai, Hiromi c/o Semiconductor Energy Lab. Co., Ltd. 398, Hase Atsugi-shi Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/47] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06009376.2 | 05.05.2006 | [2006/47] | Priority number, date | JP20050148832 | 20.05.2005 Original published format: JP 2005148832 | [2006/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1724751 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1724751 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/36 | [2006/47] | CPC: |
G09G3/3688 (EP,US);
G02F1/133 (KR);
G09G3/20 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0294 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0271 (EP,US);
G09G2340/0428 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, NL [2007/30] |
Former [2006/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Flüssigkristallanzeige und elektronische Vorrichtung | [2006/47] | English: | Liquid crystal display device and electronic apparatus | [2006/47] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage à cristaux liquides et appareil électronique | [2006/47] | Examination procedure | 10.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/25] | 12.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.11.2012 | 23.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 25.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.06.2007 | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 10.04.2013 | NL | 10.04.2013 | FR | 10.06.2013 | GB | 10.07.2013 | [2014/24] |
Former [2014/21] | FI | 10.04.2013 | |
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
GB | 10.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 10.04.2013 | |
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | NL | 10.04.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1111577 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [A] 1-29 * paragraphs [0018] , [0020] , [0037] , [0071] , [0083] , [0090] , [0101] , [0105] , [0115] ** figure 7 *; | [A]US2002011978 (YAMAZAKI SHUNPEI [JP], et al) [A] 1-29 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0010] , [0012] , [0041] , [0047] , [0064] *; | [A]EP1249822 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [A] 1-29 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] , [0011] , [0013] , [0016] , [0019] , [0022] , [0028] , [0046] , [0050] , [0055] , [0063] * | Examination | US2002075249 | US2005007392 | by applicant | US2002075249 | EP1249822 | JP2003186455 | US2005007392 |