blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1698905

EP1698905 - Nano-drive for high resolution positioning and for positioning of a multi-point probe [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  11.01.2020
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Revocation of patentpublished on 19.02.2020  [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Capres A/S
DTU Bygn. 373
2800 Lyngby / DK
[2006/36]
Inventor(s)01 / Petersen, Christian Leth
4861 Ridgelawan Drive
Burnaby BC V5C 3Y1 / CA
02 / Nielsen, Peter Folmer
Nordtoftevej 31
3250 Farum / DK
03 / Bøggild, Peter
Ægirsgade 61, 4 sal
2000 Copenhagen N / DK
04 / Quaade, Ulrich
Gammelmosevej 331
2880 Bagsværd / DK
05 / Grey, Francois
901 rue Francois Estier
01170 Echenevex / FR
 [2006/52]
Former [2006/40]01 / Petersen, Christian Leth
4861 Ridgelawan Drive
Burnaby BC V5C 3Y1 / CA
02 / Nielsen, Peter Folmer
Nordtoftevej 31
3250 Farum / DK
03 / Bøggild, Peter
Ægirsgade 61, 4 sal
2000 Copenhagen N / DK
04 / Quaade, Ulrich
Gammelmosevej 331
2880 Bagsværd / DK
05 / Grey, Francois
Boldhusgade 4
1062 Copenhagen K / DK
Former [2006/36]01 / Petersen, Christian Leth
4861 Ridgelawan Drive
Burnaby BC V5C 3Y1 / CA
02 / Nielsen, Peter Folmer
Nordtoftevej 31
3250 Farum / DK
03 / Bøggild, Peter
Ægirsgade 61, 4 sal
2000 Copenhagen N / DK
04 / Quaade, Ulrich
Gammelmosevej 331
2880 Bagsværd / DK
05 / Grey, Francois
Boldhusgade 4
1062 Copenhagen / DK
Representative(s)Budde Schou A/S
Dronningens Tvaergade 30
1302 Copenhagen K / DK
[N/P]
Former [2014/25]Budde Schou A/S
Hausergade 3
1128 Copenhagen K / DK
Former [2008/35]Nielsen, Henrik Sten
Budde Schou A/S Vester Søgade 10
1601 Copenhagen V / DK
Former [2006/36]Nielsen, Henrik Sten
Budde, Schou & Ostenfeld A/S Vester Sögade 10
1601 Copenhagen V / DK
Application number, filing date06009611.215.09.1999
[2006/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1698905
Date:06.09.2006
Language:EN
[2006/36]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1698905
Date:18.07.2007
[2007/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1698905
Date:20.07.2011
Language:EN
[2011/29]
Type: B9 Corrected patent specification 
No.:EP1698905
Date:18.01.2012
[2012/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.06.2007
ClassificationIPC:G01R1/073, G01R3/00
[2006/36]
CPC:
G01R1/073 (EP); G01R1/07307 (EP); G01R3/00 (EP);
G01R1/06727 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2006/36]
TitleGerman:Nanoantrieb für hochauflösende Positionierung und zur Positionierung einer Mehrpunktsonde[2010/45]
English:Nano-drive for high resolution positioning and for positioning of a multi-point probe[2006/36]
French:Nano-actionneur pour le positionnement de haute résolution et pour le positionnement d'une sonde à points multiples[2010/45]
Former [2006/36]Nanolaufwerk für hochauflösende Positionierung und zur Positionierung einer Mehrpunktsonde
Former [2006/36]Commande nano pour le positionnement de haute résolution et pour le positionnement d'une sonde multipoint
Examination procedure18.01.2008Examination requested  [2008/09]
14.02.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.08.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.10.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.01.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.02.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.08.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.10.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.02.2011Fee for grant paid
28.02.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP99610052.5  / EP1085327
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19990610052) is  07.07.2004
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  13.04.2012  14.05.2012  ADMISSIBLE
SmartTip BV
Drienerlolaan 5
7522 NB Enschede / NL
Opponent's representative
Altenburg, Bernardus Stephanus Franciscus
DOGIO Patents BV
PO Box 2350
1200 CJ Hilversum / NL
 [N/P]
Former [2012/22]
Opponent(s)01  13.04.2012   
SmartTip BV
Drienerlolaan 5
7522 NB Enschede / NL
Opponent's representative
Altenburg, Bernardus Stephanus Franciscus
ALTENBURG PATENT Ravelijnstraat 125
4102 AJ Culemborg / NL
27.04.2012No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
12.05.2012No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
29.08.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
17.12.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
01.04.2014Date of oral proceedings
06.05.2014Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
24.07.2019Legal effect of revocation of patent [2020/08]
12.12.2019Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition02.07.2014Appeal received No.  T1485/14
06.09.2014Statement of grounds filed
24.07.2019Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
24.07.2019Date of oral proceedings
02.08.2019Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
11.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
11.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
11.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
11.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
02.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
01.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
30.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
30.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
30.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT20.07.2011
BE20.07.2011
CY20.07.2011
DK20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
SE20.07.2011
LU15.09.2011
CH30.09.2011
LI30.09.2011
MC30.09.2011
GR21.10.2011
ES31.10.2011
PT21.11.2011
GB15.09.2013
IT15.09.2013
[2014/38]
Former [2014/34]AT20.07.2011
BE20.07.2011
CY20.07.2011
DK20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
SE20.07.2011
LU15.09.2011
CH30.09.2011
LI30.09.2011
MC30.09.2011
GR21.10.2011
ES31.10.2011
PT21.11.2011
GB15.09.2013
Former [2012/20]AT20.07.2011
BE20.07.2011
CY20.07.2011
DK20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
SE20.07.2011
MC30.09.2011
GR21.10.2011
PT21.11.2011
Former [2012/17]AT20.07.2011
BE20.07.2011
CY20.07.2011
DK20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
SE20.07.2011
GR21.10.2011
PT21.11.2011
Former [2012/12]AT20.07.2011
BE20.07.2011
CY20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
SE20.07.2011
GR21.10.2011
PT21.11.2011
Former [2012/11]AT20.07.2011
BE20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
SE20.07.2011
GR21.10.2011
PT21.11.2011
Former [2012/10]BE20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
SE20.07.2011
GR21.10.2011
PT21.11.2011
Former [2012/09]BE20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
PT21.11.2011
Documents cited:Search[X]US5172050  (SWAPP MAVIN [US]) [X] 1-6,9,10 * abstract * * column 4, line 15 - line 48 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]JPH06224449  (SHARP KK) [A] 1,5 * abstract *;
 [A]US5347226  (BACHMANN WALTER A [US], et al) [A] 1,5 * figures 5-9 *;
 [A]JPH0815318  (YAMAICHI ELECTRIC CO LTD, et al) [A] 1,5* figures 8,9 *;
 [A]WO9721105  (NAM JAE WOO [KR]) [A] 1,5 * pages 10,13 * * figures 1a-1e *;
 [A]EP0802419  (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,5 * page 7, line 17 - line 43 * * figure - *
ExaminationUS5475318
other   - Stick-Slip Piezoelectric Actuators., XP003030476
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.