EP1728475 - Surgical instruments employing sensors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 03.07.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2012/52] |
Former [2011/24] | For all designated states Tyco Healthcare Group LP Mail Stop: 8 N-1 555 Long Wharf Drive New Haven, CT 06511 / US | ||
Former [2006/49] | For all designated states Tyco Healthcare Group LP 150 Glover Avenue Norwalk, Connecticut 06856 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beetel, Robert J. 7323 Town Walk Hamden, CT / US | [2006/49] | Representative(s) | Maschio, Antonio, et al Maschio & Soames IP Limited 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/32] | Maschio, Antonio, et al Maschio & Soames IP Limited 20 Carlton Crescent Southampton, SO15 2ET / GB | ||
Former [2012/47] | Maschio, Antonio, et al Maschio & Soames LLP 20 Carlton Crescent Southampton, SO15 2ET / GB | ||
Former [2006/49] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06011501.1 | 02.06.2006 | [2006/49] | Priority number, date | US20050687243P | 03.06.2005 Original published format: US 687243 P | US20050687214P | 03.06.2005 Original published format: US 687214 P | [2006/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1728475 | Date: | 06.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1728475 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | [2007/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1728475 | Date: | 10.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/32] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1728475 | Date: | 05.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/072, A61B17/115, A61B17/068, A61B18/14, A61B17/128 | [2006/49] | CPC: |
A61B17/07207 (EP,US);
A61B17/068 (US);
A61B17/0686 (US);
A61B17/072 (EP,US);
A61B17/115 (US);
A61B17/1155 (EP,US);
A61B17/128 (EP,US);
A61B34/10 (US);
A61B90/06 (EP,US);
A61B17/29 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00022 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00039 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00106 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00119 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07214 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT [2015/32] |
Former [2007/37] | DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT | ||
Former [2006/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Chirurgisches Instrument mit Sensoren | [2006/49] | English: | Surgical instruments employing sensors | [2006/49] | French: | Instrument chirurgical employant des capteurs | [2006/49] | Examination procedure | 14.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/30] | 22.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 11.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.08.2007 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.05.2012
16.05.2012
ADMISSIBLE ETHICON ENDO-SURGERY, INC. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati Ohio 45242-2839 / US Opponent's representative Tunstall, Christopher Stephen Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/24] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.05.2012
ETHICON ENDO-SURGERY, INC. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati Ohio 45242-2839 / US Opponent's representative Tunstall, Christopher Stephen Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | 18.06.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 20.12.2012 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 21.10.2014 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 21.10.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.11.2014 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 20.11.2014 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 24.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 24.06.2015 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 02.06.2014 | ES | 03.06.2014 | [2015/50] |
Former [2015/23] | IT | 02.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0552050 (ETHICON INC [US]) [X] 1-12 * column 2, lines 45-49 - column 4, lines 47-52; figures 2,17,20a * * column 6, lines 45-54 - column 9, lines 16-24,45-58 *; | [A]US5464144 (GUY THOMAS D [US], et al) [A] 1,5,6 * column 6, line 62 - column 7, line 12; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US6221023 (MATSUBA TOMOYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 18* abstract *; | [X]WO03020139 (VLEUGELS MICHEL PETRONELLA HUB [NL], et al) [X] 1,2,4-11 * page 8, lines 13,14 - page 10, line 28; figure 1 *; | [X]WO03090630 (TYCO HEALTHCARE [US], et al) [X] 1-18 * page 3, lines 16-21.32-34 - page 4, columns 1-4,22,3, lines 30-34; figures 1,2,4 * * page 10, lines 26-34 - page 11 * * page 12, lines 15-27 - page 18, lines 14-18 * * page 23, lines 12,16-25 *; | [X]US2004153124 (WHITMAN MICHAEL P [US]) [X] 1-10,12 * paragraphs [0048] , [0056]; figures 3,4 * | by applicant | US6817508 | US2004232201 | US2005222616 | US2006097075 | US2007179408 | Opposition | US5383880 | US5433721 | US5503320 | US5666710 |