EP1739822 - Three phase BLDC motor controller and control method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.03.2010 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/01] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oh, Kwang-kyo Hyunfai Apt. 105-1403 Pungam-dong Seo-gu Gwanju-city / KR | 02 /
Yoo, Han-joo Jugong Apt. 201-1704 Unnam-dong Gwangsan-gu Gwangju-city / KR | 03 /
Hamaoka, Koji Chumdan Line Apt. 122-410,65-2 Wolgye-dong Gwangsan-gu Gwangju-city / KR | 04 /
Park, Pyeong-ki Hoban Apt. 104-904 Singa-dong Gwangsan-gu Gwangju-city / KR | 05 /
Seo, Jeong-ho Line Apt. 207-302 Wolgye-dong Gwangsan-gu Gwangju-city / KR | 06 /
Bae, Hun-yub 101 837-9 Ilgok-dong Buk-gu Gwangju-city / KR | 07 /
Kim, Yun-jeong 997-58 Ssangchon-dong Seo-gu Gwanju / KR | [2007/01] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/01] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06012172.0 | 13.06.2006 | [2007/01] | Priority number, date | KR20050056626 | 28.06.2005 Original published format: KR 20050056626 | [2007/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1739822 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H02P6/18 | [2007/01] | CPC: |
H02P6/182 (EP,US);
H02P1/18 (KR);
H02P6/15 (EP,US);
H02P6/18 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2007/36] |
Former [2007/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Reglung für einen drei Phasen bürstenlosen Gleichstrommotor und entsprechendes Regelverfahren | [2007/01] | English: | Three phase BLDC motor controller and control method thereof | [2007/01] | French: | Contrôle d'un moteur à courant continu sans balai à trois phases et procédé de contrôle correspondant | [2007/01] | Examination procedure | 13.06.2006 | Examination requested [2007/01] | 04.07.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 01.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 10.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/15] | 13.11.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/15] | 24.11.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5017845 (CAROBOLANTE FRANCESCO [US], et al) [A] 1-10* abstract *; | [Y]US5019756 (SCHWARZ MARCOS G [BR]) [Y] 1-10 * column 4, line 51 - column 5, line 44 *; | [Y]US5023527 (ERDMAN DAVID M [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * column 10, line 16 - line 68 * * column 12, line 34 - column 13, line 2 *; | [A]EP0735662 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * |