EP1748196 - Locking system for telescopic tubes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gipron Giuseppe Pronzati Srl Via Paolo Ferrario 126 20010 Vanzago MI / IT | [2007/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pronzati, Lorenzo Piazza Napoli 15 20100 Milano / IT | [2007/05] | Representative(s) | Petruzziello, Aldo Racheli S.r.l. Viale San Michele del Carso, 4 20144 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/05] | Petruzziello, Aldo Racheli & C. S.p.A. Viale San Michele del Carso, 4 20144 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 06012241.3 | 14.06.2006 | [2007/05] | Priority number, date | IT2005MI01441 | 26.07.2005 Original published format: IT MI20051441 | [2007/05] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1748196 | Date: | 31.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1748196 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16B7/14, F16B7/18 | [2007/05] | CPC: |
F16B7/1463 (EP);
A45B9/00 (EP);
A45B2009/007 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/05] | Title | German: | Verriegelungsvorrichtung für teleskopische Rohre | [2007/05] | English: | Locking system for telescopic tubes | [2007/05] | French: | Dispositif de verrouillage de deux tubes téléscopiques | [2007/05] | Examination procedure | 27.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/37] | 30.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.09.2008 | BE | 17.09.2008 | CY | 17.09.2008 | CZ | 17.09.2008 | DK | 17.09.2008 | EE | 17.09.2008 | FI | 17.09.2008 | LT | 17.09.2008 | LV | 17.09.2008 | NL | 17.09.2008 | PL | 17.09.2008 | RO | 17.09.2008 | SI | 17.09.2008 | SK | 17.09.2008 | TR | 17.09.2008 | BG | 17.12.2008 | SE | 17.12.2008 | GR | 18.12.2008 | ES | 28.12.2008 | IS | 17.01.2009 | PT | 17.02.2009 | HU | 18.03.2009 | IE | 14.06.2009 | LU | 14.06.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
BE | 17.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2008 | ||
DK | 17.09.2008 | ||
EE | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
LT | 17.09.2008 | ||
LV | 17.09.2008 | ||
NL | 17.09.2008 | ||
PL | 17.09.2008 | ||
RO | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SK | 17.09.2008 | ||
BG | 17.12.2008 | ||
SE | 17.12.2008 | ||
GR | 18.12.2008 | ||
ES | 28.12.2008 | ||
IS | 17.01.2009 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
HU | 18.03.2009 | ||
IE | 14.06.2009 | ||
LU | 14.06.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
BE | 17.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2008 | ||
DK | 17.09.2008 | ||
EE | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
LT | 17.09.2008 | ||
LV | 17.09.2008 | ||
NL | 17.09.2008 | ||
PL | 17.09.2008 | ||
RO | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SK | 17.09.2008 | ||
BG | 17.12.2008 | ||
SE | 17.12.2008 | ||
GR | 18.12.2008 | ||
ES | 28.12.2008 | ||
IS | 17.01.2009 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
IE | 14.06.2009 | ||
LU | 14.06.2009 | ||
Former [2011/02] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
BE | 17.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2008 | ||
DK | 17.09.2008 | ||
EE | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
LT | 17.09.2008 | ||
LV | 17.09.2008 | ||
NL | 17.09.2008 | ||
PL | 17.09.2008 | ||
RO | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SK | 17.09.2008 | ||
BG | 17.12.2008 | ||
SE | 17.12.2008 | ||
GR | 18.12.2008 | ||
ES | 28.12.2008 | ||
IS | 17.01.2009 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
IE | 14.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
BE | 17.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2008 | ||
DK | 17.09.2008 | ||
EE | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
LT | 17.09.2008 | ||
LV | 17.09.2008 | ||
NL | 17.09.2008 | ||
PL | 17.09.2008 | ||
RO | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SK | 17.09.2008 | ||
BG | 17.12.2008 | ||
SE | 17.12.2008 | ||
ES | 28.12.2008 | ||
IS | 17.01.2009 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
IE | 14.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/13] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
BE | 17.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2008 | ||
DK | 17.09.2008 | ||
EE | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
LT | 17.09.2008 | ||
LV | 17.09.2008 | ||
NL | 17.09.2008 | ||
RO | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SK | 17.09.2008 | ||
BG | 17.12.2008 | ||
SE | 17.12.2008 | ||
ES | 28.12.2008 | ||
IS | 17.01.2009 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
BE | 17.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2008 | ||
DK | 17.09.2008 | ||
EE | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
LT | 17.09.2008 | ||
LV | 17.09.2008 | ||
NL | 17.09.2008 | ||
RO | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SK | 17.09.2008 | ||
BG | 17.12.2008 | ||
ES | 28.12.2008 | ||
IS | 17.01.2009 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/28] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
BE | 17.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
LT | 17.09.2008 | ||
LV | 17.09.2008 | ||
NL | 17.09.2008 | ||
RO | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SK | 17.09.2008 | ||
BG | 17.12.2008 | ||
ES | 28.12.2008 | ||
IS | 17.01.2009 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
BE | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
LT | 17.09.2008 | ||
LV | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
ES | 28.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
BE | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
LT | 17.09.2008 | ||
LV | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
LT | 17.09.2008 | ||
LV | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | LT | 17.09.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2342624 (CAPRINI PIETRO [IT]) [X] 1,2,10,12-14 * figures 6,7 *; | [X]JPH1030617 (TAIYO KOGYO CO LTD) [X] 1-5,10-14 * figures 1-11 *; | [A]DE19740823 (HILTI AG [LI]) [A] 5-8* the whole document *; | [X]US6302614 (TSENG YUN-CHIH [TW]) [X] 1-3,10,12-14 * abstract * * figures 2-7 * |