|
24.04.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2013 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.08.2013 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.08.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.08.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.08.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.08.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.07.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.2013 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
19 |
|
12.07.2013 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.03.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.03.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.03.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.03.2013 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
16.01.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.01.2013 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
08.01.2013 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
42 |
|
30.11.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.11.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.11.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.11.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.11.2012 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.11.2012 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
8 |
|
17.02.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2012 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
12.01.2012 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.01.2012 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.10.2011 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.10.2011 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.10.2011 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.10.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
14.10.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
23.08.2011 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.08.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.2011 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.08.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.08.2011 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.06.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.06.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.06.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2011 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.06.2011 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2011 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.06.2011 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
15.06.2011 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2011 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2011 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2011 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.06.2011 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.06.2011 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.04.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.04.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.04.2011 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.01.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.01.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2011 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.01.2011 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.01.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2011 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2010 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
10.09.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.2010 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.2010 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2010 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2010 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
11.06.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
11.06.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.06.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
11.06.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
40 |
|
08.06.2010 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
08.06.2010 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.2009 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.06.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2009 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2009 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.06.2009 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.06.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2009 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2009 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.03.2009 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2009 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
22.09.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.09.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.09.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.07.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2008 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2008 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.01.2008 |
Information about publication, reminder payment of designation fee, response to extended European search report, if applicable |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.12.2007 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2007 |
The request for correction will be decided by the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2007 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2007 |
Request for correction of errors in filed documents |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.01.2007 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.01.2007 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.01.2007 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.2006 |
(Partial) set of drawings filed in response to formal objections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2006 |
Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.09.2006 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.09.2006 |
Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2006 |
Invitation to remedy deficiencies in application documents |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.07.2006 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2006 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2006 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.07.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
13.07.2006 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.07.2006 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |