EP1750221 - System, method, and computer program to predict the likelihood, the extent, and the time of an event or change occurrence using a combination of cognitive causal models with reasoning and text processing for knowledge driven decision support [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.11.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | [2007/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kipersztok, Oscar 7536 146th Avenue NE Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | [2007/06] | Representative(s) | Lindner, Michael, et al Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/06] | Lindner, Michael, et al Witte, Weller & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 06014663.6 | 14.07.2006 | [2007/06] | Priority number, date | US20050699109P | 14.07.2005 Original published format: US 699109 P | US20050220213 | 06.09.2005 Original published format: US 220213 | [2007/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1750221 | Date: | 07.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00 | [2007/06] | CPC: |
G06Q10/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/06] | Title | German: | System, Verfahren und Computerprogramm zur Vorhersage von Wahrscheinlichkeit, Ausmass und Zeit des Auftretens eines Ereignisses oder einer Änderung mittels Kombination kognitiver Kausalmodelle mit Schlussfolgerung und Textverarbeitung für wissensgesteuerte Entscheidungsunterstützung | [2007/06] | English: | System, method, and computer program to predict the likelihood, the extent, and the time of an event or change occurrence using a combination of cognitive causal models with reasoning and text processing for knowledge driven decision support | [2007/06] | French: | Système, procédé et programme informatique prédisant la probabilité, l'étendue, la durée d'un événement ou de l'apparition d'un changement utilisant une combinaison de modèles causaux cognitifs avec résonance et de traitement de textes pour le support de décisions géré par la connaissance | [2007/06] | Examination procedure | 07.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/34] | 29.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 26.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/52] | 29.06.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/52] | 10.08.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 26.06.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 26.06.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO02101555 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [X] 1-19 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 6 * * page 3, paragraph 11 - page 5, paragraph 16 * * page 7, paragraph 21 *; | [X]WO2004042493 (LAB FOR INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY [SG], et al) [X] 1-19 * abstract * * page 1, line 5 - page 2, line 6 * * page 2, line 28 - page 4, line 14 * * page 5, line 25 - page 8, line 15 * * page 16, lines 12-30 *; | [X]US2005028033 (KIPERSZTOK OSCAR [US], et al) [X] 1-19 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 2, paragraph 13 - page 3, paragraph 14 * * page 4, paragraph 22 - page 5, paragraph 30 * * page 6, paragraph 44 * * page 7, paragraph 47 - page 8, paragraph 58 *; | [X] - MITTERMAYER M-A, "Forecasting intraday stock price trends with text mining techniques", SYSTEM SCIENCES, 2004. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 37TH ANNUAL HAWAII INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON 5-8 JAN. 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20040105), ISBN 0-7695-2056-1, pages 64 - 73, XP010683136 [X] 1-19 * abstract * * pages 1-3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/HICSS.2004.1265201 | [A] - SAKURAI S ET AL, "Analysis of daily business reports based on sequential text mining method", SYSTEMS, MAN AND CYBERNETICS, 2004 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON THE HAGUE, THE NETHERLANDS 10-13 OCT. 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20041010), vol. 4, ISBN 0-7803-8566-7, pages 3279 - 3284, XP010773262 [A] 1,4,10,13,17,19 * abstract * * page 3279, paragraph 1 "Introduction" * * pages 3279-3280, paragraph 2.1 "Problem" * | [A] - ZANASI A, "TEXT MINING: THE NEW COMPETITVE INTELLIGENCE FRONTIER. REAL CASES IN INDUSTRIAL, BANKING AND TELECOM/SMES WORLD", VEILLE SCIENTIFIQUE ET STRATEGIQUE. VSST. CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS, (20011017), pages 1 - 17, XP008039185 [A] 1,10,17 * abstract * * part 1 "Overview", pages 1-2 * * part 2.1 "Text Mining, Introduction", page 3 * * part 3.1 "The solution, Overview", page 5 * |