EP1792695 - Perforator with a plurality of punchheads [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Erwin Müller GmbH Breslauer Strasse 34-38 49808 Lingen / DE | [2007/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Quaing, Reinhard Zum Fernen Sand 45 48488 Emsbüren / DE | 02 /
Heskamp, Ingo Zum Glockenturm 26 49808 Lingen / DE | [2007/23] | Representative(s) | Busse & Busse Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 12 26 49002 Osnabrück / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/34] | Busse & Busse Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 1226 49002 Osnabrück / DE | ||
Former [2007/23] | Busse & Busse Patentanwälte Grosshandelsring 6 49084 Osnabrück / DE | Application number, filing date | 06019312.5 | 15.09.2006 | [2007/23] | Priority number, date | DE20052018944U | 05.12.2005 Original published format: DE 202005018944 U | [2007/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1792695 | Date: | 06.06.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1792695 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B26D5/02, B26F1/36 | [2007/23] | CPC: |
B26F1/36 (EP);
B26D5/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/23] | Title | German: | Mehrfachlocher | [2007/23] | English: | Perforator with a plurality of punchheads | [2007/23] | French: | Perforateur avec plusiers têtes de poinçonnage | [2007/23] | Examination procedure | 05.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/03] | 09.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.01.2008 | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 24.08.2011 | CZ | 24.08.2011 | DK | 24.08.2011 | EE | 24.08.2011 | FI | 24.08.2011 | IE | 24.08.2011 | LT | 24.08.2011 | LV | 24.08.2011 | NL | 24.08.2011 | PL | 24.08.2011 | RO | 24.08.2011 | SI | 24.08.2011 | SK | 24.08.2011 | TR | 24.08.2011 | LU | 15.09.2011 | BE | 30.09.2011 | CH | 30.09.2011 | LI | 30.09.2011 | MC | 30.09.2011 | BG | 24.11.2011 | GR | 25.11.2011 | ES | 05.12.2011 | IS | 24.12.2011 | PT | 26.12.2011 | [2013/44] |
Former [2013/29] | CY | 24.08.2011 | |
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
LU | 15.09.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
BG | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
ES | 05.12.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 24.08.2011 | |
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
LU | 15.09.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
ES | 05.12.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 24.08.2011 | |
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
ES | 05.12.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | CY | 24.08.2011 | |
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/30] | CY | 24.08.2011 | |
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 24.08.2011 | |
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | CY | 24.08.2011 | |
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | CY | 24.08.2011 | |
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | CY | 24.08.2011 | |
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | FI | 24.08.2011 | |
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | FI | 24.08.2011 | |
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 24.08.2011 | |
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | LT | 24.08.2011 | |
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]DE3826605 (ZIEBARTH JUERGEN [DE]) [Y] 4-9 * column 3 * [A] 1-3; | [A]DE9011236U (ZIEBARTH, JUERGEN OTTO, DIPL.-KAUFM., 7000 STUTTGART, DE) [A] 1-9* the whole document *; | [XY]EP0540827 (LEITZ LOUIS KG [DE]) [X] 1-3 * figure 1 * [Y] 4-9 |