|
15.04.2019 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.2019 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.2019 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2019 |
Clean copy of description pages in the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2019 |
English translation of the claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2019 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.02.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.01.2019 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2019 |
Notification of termination of representative's authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2018 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.12.2018 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.12.2018 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.12.2018 |
OPPODREX with handwritten amendments |
Opposition |
7 |
|
19.11.2018 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.05.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.05.2018 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.05.2018 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.05.2018 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
31 |
|
23.05.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.05.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2018 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
26 |
|
09.02.2018 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2018 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
26 |
|
09.02.2018 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2018 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.02.2018 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
28.11.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.11.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.11.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.2017 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
23.11.2017 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.11.2017 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
23.11.2017 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.2017 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.2017 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.11.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.11.2017 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.11.2017 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.11.2017 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.11.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.11.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.10.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.10.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.10.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.10.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.10.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.10.2017 |
Communication of amended entries |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.09.2017 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.09.2017 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.07.2017 |
Request for a change of address - opponent |
Appeal |
12 |
|
29.03.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.03.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.03.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.03.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.03.2017 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.03.2017 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.03.2017 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
16 |
|
14.03.2017 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.02.2017 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.10.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.10.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.10.2014 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.10.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.10.2014 |
Description |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.10.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.10.2014 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
04.08.2014 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.2014 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.2014 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.05.2014 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.2014 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.05.2014 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
20 |
|
12.05.2014 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
12.05.2014 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
12.05.2014 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
12.05.2014 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
12.05.2014 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
24 |
|
12.05.2014 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
16 |
|
08.05.2014 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
16 |
|
11.03.2014 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.03.2014 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.03.2014 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.03.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.02.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.2014 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.01.2014 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.2014 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
08.01.2014 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
08.01.2014 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.01.2014 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.2014 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.01.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.2014 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.2014 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
05.12.2013 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.11.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2013 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2013 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.11.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2013 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.10.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.10.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.10.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2013 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.08.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2013 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
18.07.2013 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.07.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.2013 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.03.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.03.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.03.2013 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.2013 |
Communication concerning statement of surrender/lapse of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.02.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.02.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.02.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.2013 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.02.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended opponent data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended opponent data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended opponent data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.09.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.2012 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
322 |
|
09.08.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
436 |
|
09.08.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
532 |
|
09.08.2012 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
122 |
|
09.08.2012 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.2012 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
09.08.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
09.08.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
09.08.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
09.08.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
13.10.2011 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.10.2011 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2011 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2011 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.09.2011 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2011 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2011 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.05.2011 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2011 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.05.2011 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2011 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
27.05.2011 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2011 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
21.04.2011 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2011 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.04.2011 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2011 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
11.03.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.03.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.03.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.11.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2009 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.03.2009 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2009 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
03.03.2009 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.10.2008 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2008 |
Partial European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.05.2007 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.10.2006 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2006 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
28.09.2006 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2006 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.09.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
21.09.2006 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.09.2006 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2006 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |