EP1777744 - IC-package having an array of embedded capacitors for low noise power delivery and for decoupling in the mid-frequency range of 1MHz to 3GHz. Methods of forming the IC-package. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.06.2011 [2011/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington DE 19898 / US | ||
Former [2007/17] | For all designated states E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Swaminathan, Madhavan 1458 Grovehurst Drive Marrietta Georgia 30062 / US | 02 /
Wan, Lixi 425 Villa Place Court Tucker Georgia 30084 / US | 03 /
Engin, Ege 251 10th Street NW A711 Atlanta Georgia 30318 / US | 04 /
Muthana, Prathap 939 Piedmont Avenue Apt. 10 Atlanta Georgia 30309 / US | [2007/17] | Representative(s) | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/17] | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 06019852.0 | 22.09.2006 | [2007/17] | Priority number, date | US20050729273P | 21.10.2005 Original published format: US 729273 P | US20060514097 | 31.08.2006 Original published format: US 514097 | [2007/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1777744 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1777744 | Date: | 12.05.2010 | [2010/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/498, H05K1/16, H01L23/50, H01L23/64 | [2007/17] | CPC: |
H05K1/162 (EP,US);
H01L23/02 (KR);
H01L23/49822 (EP,US);
H01L23/50 (EP,US);
H01L23/66 (EP,US);
H10B12/00 (KR);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15311 (EP,US);
H01L2924/3011 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09309 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09509 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09536 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09618 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09763 (EP,US);
H05K3/429 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2011/03] |
Former [2007/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Gehäuse für integrierte Schaltung mit einem Netzwerk von eingebetteten Kondensatoren für rauscharme Versorgung und Entkopplung in dem Frequenzbereich von 1MHz bis 3GHz. Herstellungsverfahren des Gehäuses. | [2007/17] | English: | IC-package having an array of embedded capacitors for low noise power delivery and for decoupling in the mid-frequency range of 1MHz to 3GHz. Methods of forming the IC-package. | [2007/17] | French: | Boîtier pour circuit intégré avec un réseau de condensateurs enfouis pour une alimentation à faible niveau de bruit et découplage aux fréquences intermédiaires entre 1MHz et 3GHz. Procédés de fabrication du boîtier | [2007/17] | Examination procedure | 13.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/24] | 27.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6446317 (FIGUEROA DAVID G [US], et al) [A] 1-10* column 1, line 14 - column 15, line 49; figures 4-26 *; | [A]WO03019656 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 5 - page 29; figures 1-7 *; | [X] - MUTHANA P ET AL, "Design, modeling and characterization of embedded capacitor networks for mid-frequency decoupling in semiconductor systems", ELECTROMAGNETIC COMPATIBILITY, 2005. EMC 2005. 2005 INTERNATIONAL SYMP OSIUM ON CHICAGO, IL, USA 8-12 AUG. 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20050808), vol. 2, ISBN 978-0-7803-9380-6, pages 638 - 643, XP010839238 [X] 1-10 * page 638, column 1; figures 1,2,4-18 * * page 640, column 2 - page 642, column 2 * * page 639, column 1 - column 2 * * page 643, column 1 - column 2 * | [XA] - LIXI WAN ET AL, "Design, Simulation and Measurement Techniques for Embedded Decoupling Capacitors in Multi-GHz Packages/PCBs", ELECTRONIC PACKAGING TECHNOLOGY, 2005 6TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SHENZHEN, CHINA 30-02 AUG. 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20050830), ISBN 978-0-7803-9449-0, pages 1 - 5, XP010869400 [X] 1-5,10 * column 1 - column 3; figures 1,2,3,6 * [A] 6-9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICEPT.2005.1564691 | [A] - THOMASON C ET AL, "High Capacitance Density Thin Film Integrated Tantalum Pentoxide Decoupling Capacitors", ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS AND TECHNOLOGY, 2005. ECTC '05. PROCEEDINGS LAKE BUENA VISTA, FL, USA MAY 31-JUNE 3, 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20050531), ISBN 978-0-7803-8907-6, pages 779 - 782, XP010808747 [A] 1-10 * column 1; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ECTC.2005.1441360 |