EP1738829 - Polymerase chain reaction system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.12.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2011 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 11.01.2012 [2012/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/01] | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street Oakland CA 94607-5200 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Benett, William J. 2205 Vantage Lane Livermore, CA 94550 / US | 02 /
Richards, James, B. 1463 Lawrence Road Danville, CA 94506 / US | 03 /
Stratton, Paul, L. 1369 Windsor Way Brentwood, CA 94513 / US | 04 /
Hadley, Dean, R. 449 Chablis Way Manteca, CA 95337 / US | 05 /
Milanovich, Fred, P. 3383 Woodview Drive Lafayette, CA 94549 / US | 06 /
Belgrader, Phillip 719 Pebble Way Manteca, CA 95336 / US | 07 /
Meyer, Peter, L. P.O.Box 158 Mt. Aukurn, CA 95656 / US | [2007/01] | Representative(s) | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/01] | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al LADAS & PARRY LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06020621.6 | 03.01.2001 | [2007/01] | Priority number, date | US20000174416P | 04.01.2000 Original published format: US 174416 P | US20000752794 | 29.12.2000 Original published format: US 752794 | [2007/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1738829 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B01L7/00, B01J19/00, G01N21/03 | [2007/01] | CPC: |
B01L7/52 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2007/01] | Title | German: | Polymerase-Kettenreaktionssystem | [2007/01] | English: | Polymerase chain reaction system | [2007/01] | French: | Systeme d'amplification en chaine par polymerase | [2007/01] | Examination procedure | 23.10.2006 | Examination requested [2007/01] | 20.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/36] | 01.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/02] | 08.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/02] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01939975.7 / EP1246700 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5721123 (HAYES DONALD J [US], et al) [X] 1-28 * columns 4-6; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US5589136 (NORTHRUP M ALLEN [US], et al) [A] 1-28 * figures 4-6 *; | [A]WO9838487 (CEPHEID [US], et al) [A] 1-28 * figures 2,5,9 *; | [A]EP0545284 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-28 * figure 1 *; | [A]US5229580 (CHIONIERE MICHAEL J [US]) [A] 1-28 * figures 1-5 *; | [A]US3949806 (DUNGES WOLFGANG) [A] 1-28 * figure 1 *; | [A]US5888728 (OLSON JOHN D [US], et al) [A] 1-28 * column 14, line 5 - line 25 *; | [A]WO9912016 (CALIPER TECHN CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-28 * page 52, line 30 - page 53, line 10 * |