EP1772829 - Method of generating an image of a moving object using prestored motion data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.02.2018 [2018/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Square Enix (also trading as Square Enix Co., Ltd.) Shinjuku Bunka Quint Building 3-22-7 Yoyogi, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-8544 / JP | For all designated states Nintendo Co., Ltd. 11-1 Kamitoba Hokotate-cho Minami-ku Kyoto 601-8501 / JP | [2012/15] |
Former [2009/09] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Square Enix (also trading as Square Enix Co., Ltd.) Shinjuku Bunka Quint Building 3-22-7 Yogogi, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-8544 / JP | ||
For all designated states NINTENDO CO., LTD. 11-1, Hokotake-cho Kamitoba Minami-ku Kyoto 601-8501 / JP | |||
Former [2009/08] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Square Enix Holdings (also trading as Square Enix Holdings Co., Ltd.) 4-31-8 Yoyogi, Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states NINTENDO CO., LTD. 11-1, Hokotake-cho Kamitoba Minami-ku Kyoto 601-8501 / JP | |||
Former [2007/15] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Square Enix (also trading as Square Enix Co., Ltd.) 3-22-7, Yoyogi, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-8544 / JP | ||
For all designated states NINTENDO CO., LTD. 11-1, Hokotake-cho Kamitoba Minami-ku Kyoto 601-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Azuma, Shin c/o Square Enix Co., Ltd. Applause Tower, 19-19 Chayamachi Kita-ku Osaka 530-0013 / JP | [2007/15] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/15] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06020879.0 | 04.10.2006 | [2007/15] | Priority number, date | JP20050291801 | 04.10.2005 Original published format: JP 2005291801 | [2007/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1772829 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1772829 | Date: | 05.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06T15/70, A63F13/10 | [2016/52] | CPC: |
G06T13/40 (EP,US);
A63F13/426 (US);
A63F13/2145 (EP,US);
A63F13/26 (EP,US);
A63F13/42 (EP);
A63F13/52 (EP);
A63F13/525 (US);
A63F13/812 (EP,US);
A63F13/92 (EP);
A63F13/95 (EP);
A63F2300/1075 (EP,US);
A63F2300/204 (EP,US);
A63F2300/301 (EP,US);
A63F2300/6045 (EP,US);
A63F2300/66 (EP);
A63F2300/8011 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/15] | G06T15/70 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Erzeugung eines Bildes von einem sich bewegenden Objekt unter Benutzung von vorgespeicherten Bewegungsdaten | [2007/15] | English: | Method of generating an image of a moving object using prestored motion data | [2007/15] | French: | Procédé pour la formation d'une image, d'un objet en mouvement utilisant des données de mouvement pré-enregistrées | [2007/15] | Examination procedure | 28.12.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6462742 (ROSE CHARLES F [US], et al) [A] 2 * the whole document *; | [I]US2002178011 (YOTORIYAMA HIROAKI [JP], et al) [I] 1,22-24 * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0082] *; | [A]US2003016222 (BUDIN CLAY A [US], et al) [A] 2-8* paragraph [0028] *; | [IY]GB2390308 (GREEN SOLUTIONS LTD [GB]) [I] 1-10,22-24 * page 2, line 1 - line 6 * * page 3, line 28 - page 4, line 5 * * page 9, line 20 - line 31 * [Y] 11,18-21; | [A]US2004209680 (OYAMADA HIDEYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-24 * paragraphs [0038] , [0112] , [0113] *; | [Y]US2005159197 (TAWARA MASAKI [JP]) [Y] 11 * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0083]; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2005176486 (NISHIMURA KENTARO [JP], et al) [Y] 18-21 * paragraphs [9.62] , [0074] , [0077] , [0120]; figures 1,3,22 *; | [A] - STEVEN BERGNER ET AL, "Interactive spectral volume rendering", VIS 2002. IEEE VISUALIZATION 2002. PROCEEDINGS. BOSTON, MA, OCT. 27 - NOV. 1, 2002; [ANNUAL IEEE CONFERENCE ON VISUALIZATION], NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20021027), ISBN 978-0-7803-7498-0, pages 101 - 108, XP058097043 [A] 2,7,8 * section 3.3. Navigating Visibility;; figure 3 * | [A] - Munetoshi Unuma ET AL, "This paper describes the method for Fourier Principles for Emotion-based Human Figure Animation", SIGGRAPH '95 Proceedings of the 22nd annual conference on Computer graphics and interactive techniques, (1995), pages 91 - 96, URL: http://dl.acm.org/ft_gateway.cfm?id=218419&ftid=65895&dwn=1&CFID=687056507&CFTOKEN=29299073, (20161118), XP055320772 [A] 2 * the whole document * | [A] - BRUDERLIN A ET AL, "MOTION SIGNAL PROCESSING", SIGGRAPH 95 CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS : AUGUST 6 - 11, 1995, [LOS ANGELES, CALIFORNIA]; [COMPUTER GRAPHICS PROCEEDINGS (SIGGRAPH)], ACM, NEW YORK, NY, USA, (19950806), doi:10.1145/218380.218421, ISBN 978-0-89791-701-8, pages 97 - 104, XP000546220 [A] 2 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/218380.218421 | [Y] - SANG II PARK ET AL, "On-line motion blending for real-time locomotion generation", COMPUTER ANIMATION AND VIRTUAL WORLDS, JOHN WILEY & SONS LTD, GB, (200407), vol. 15, no. 3-4, doi:10.1002/CAV.15, ISSN 1546-4261, pages 125 - 138, XP002637211 [Y] 12-17 * page 127 * * page 131 - page 132 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/CAV.15 | [Y] - PERLIN K ET AL, "Improv: a system for scripting interactive actors in virtual worlds", COMPUTER GRAPHICS PROCEEDINGS. SIGGRAPH '96, ACM, NEW YORK, US, vol. 23, doi:10.1145/237170.237258, ISBN 978-0-89791-746-9, (1996), pages 205 - 216, (19960101), XP002570496 [Y] 12-17 * page 208, section Action Buffering * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/237170.237258 |