EP1780112 - Bicycle bottom bracket assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.07.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHIMANO INC. 3-77, Oimatsu-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City Osaka 590-8577 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/18] | For all designated states SHIMANO INC. 3-77 Oimatsu-cho, Sakai-ku, Sakai City Osaka 590-8577 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kitagawa, Kozo 3-77 Oimatsu-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City Osaka 590-8577 / JP | [2007/18] | Representative(s) | Harrison, Robert John, et al Sonnenberg Harrison Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 33 08 65 80068 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/18] | Harrison, Robert John, et al Sonnenberg Fortmann Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 08 65 80068 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06022228.8 | 24.10.2006 | [2007/18] | Priority number, date | US20050730850P | 28.10.2005 Original published format: US 730850 P | US20060438213 | 23.05.2006 Original published format: US 438213 | [2007/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1780112 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/18] | Classification | IPC: | B62M3/00 | [2007/18] | CPC: |
B62M3/003 (EP,US);
Y10T74/2164 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Tretlager für Fahrrad | [2007/18] | English: | Bicycle bottom bracket assembly | [2007/18] | French: | Pédalier pour bicyclette | [2007/18] | Examination procedure | 17.07.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/35] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | JPS60161685U | US5924801 | US2003097900 |