|
30.09.2016 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.06.2016 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2016 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.12.2015 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.11.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.10.2015 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.09.2015 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
27.08.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.08.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.08.2015 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.06.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2015 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.05.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
25 |
|
21.05.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2015 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
6 |
|
23.04.2015 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
31.03.2015 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.03.2015 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.12.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2014 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.12.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.12.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.12.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Appeal |
24 |
|
04.12.2014 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.12.2014 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.12.2014 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.12.2014 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.11.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.11.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
16.08.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.08.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.08.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.08.2014 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.08.2014 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.08.2014 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.08.2014 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.08.2014 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
3 |
|
30.07.2014 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
24.07.2014 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.07.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.07.2014 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.06.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.06.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.06.2014 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.06.2014 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
25 |
|
18.06.2014 |
Outgoing annexe(s) - Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
31 |
|
18.06.2014 |
Outgoing annexe(s) - Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
111 |
|
18.06.2014 |
Outgoing annexe(s) - Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
18.06.2014 |
Outgoing annexe(s) - Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
21 |
|
13.06.2014 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.2014 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2014 |
General enquiry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2012 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.09.2012 |
General enquiry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.03.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
3 |
|
26.03.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.01.2011 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.01.2011 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.2010 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.2010 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.06.2010 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.06.2010 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.06.2010 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
07.06.2010 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
22.03.2010 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.02.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.01.2010 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.01.2010 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2010 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2010 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2010 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2010 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.01.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.01.2010 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2010 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.01.2010 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
28.01.2010 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.01.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2010 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.12.2009 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2009 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2009 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.11.2009 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.11.2009 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.11.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
17.06.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.06.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.06.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
12.06.2009 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.06.2009 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2008 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2008 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.07.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.07.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.06.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2008 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2007 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no declaration of maintenance of the application/non-reply to the Written Opinion) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2007 |
Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2007 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2007 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2007 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2007 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.02.2007 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.12.2006 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2006 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
50 |
|
03.11.2006 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
03.11.2006 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2006 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
03.11.2006 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |