|
23.04.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.04.2018 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2018 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.03.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.03.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.03.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.03.2018 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
16.03.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.02.2018 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.02.2018 |
F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
26.01.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.01.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.01.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.01.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.01.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.01.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.01.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.01.2018 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.09.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.09.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.09.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.09.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.09.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.09.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.09.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.09.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.09.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.09.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.09.2017 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.09.2017 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.09.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.09.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.09.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.09.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.09.2017 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.09.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.09.2017 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.09.2017 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.08.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.08.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.08.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.08.2017 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.08.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.07.2017 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.07.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.07.2017 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.07.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.07.2017 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.07.2017 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
19.07.2017 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.11.2015 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.10.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.09.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.09.2015 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
21 |
|
18.09.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.09.2015 |
Request for change of name -opponent |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.09.2015 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.09.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.2015 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.07.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2014 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
25.04.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.04.2014 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.03.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.03.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.03.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.03.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.03.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.03.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.03.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.03.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.03.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.03.2014 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
16 |
|
25.02.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.2014 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
05.12.2013 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.11.2013 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.10.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.10.2013 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
22.10.2013 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
22.10.2013 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
22.10.2013 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
22.10.2013 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
22.10.2013 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
30 |
|
22.10.2013 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
22.10.2013 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
44 |
|
22.10.2013 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
22.10.2013 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
22.10.2013 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
22.10.2013 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
28 |
|
18.10.2013 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
82 |
|
18.10.2013 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
71 |
|
18.10.2013 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
27 |
|
28.08.2013 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.08.2013 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.08.2013 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.08.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.08.2013 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.08.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.08.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.08.2013 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.08.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.08.2013 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.08.2013 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.08.2013 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
01.08.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2013 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.2013 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
19.06.2013 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.2013 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
19.06.2013 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
19.06.2013 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.06.2013 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.2013 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.06.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.2013 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.2013 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.04.2013 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2013 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
13 |
|
01.03.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.02.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.02.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.02.2013 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
21.02.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2013 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2013 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.12.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.12.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2012 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
04.12.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2012 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.06.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
14.02.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.02.2012 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
17.11.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2011 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.10.2011 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
12.10.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
12.10.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
12.10.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
12.10.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
12.10.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
12.10.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
12.10.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
44 |
|
12.10.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
12.10.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
12.10.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
12.10.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
16.12.2010 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.12.2010 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2010 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2010 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.11.2010 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2010 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.11.2010 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.2010 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.2010 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.09.2010 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.2010 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
07.01.2010 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.10.2009 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.04.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.04.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.12.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2008 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2008 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2008 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2008 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.04.2008 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.05.2007 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2007 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.05.2007 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.11.2006 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2006 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.11.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.11.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
09.11.2006 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2006 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
07.11.2006 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.11.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
07.11.2006 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2006 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.11.2006 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2006 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |