EP1790386 - Improved carrying system with breathing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2015 [2015/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Black Diamond Equipment AG Christoph Merian-Ring 7 4153 Reinach / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2007/22] | For all designated states Black Diamond Equipment AG Christoph Merian Ring 7 4153 Reinach / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schipper, David PO Box 522311 Salt Lake City UT 84152 / US | 02 /
Wilkening, Peter 3821 SO 1300 E UT 84106 / US | 03 /
Narajowski, David 8657 Gorgoza Dr. Park City UT 84098 / US | 04 /
Terry, Paul 3450 Wrangler Way Park City UT 84098 / US | 05 /
Laakso, Thomas 4345 Hidden Cove Park City UT 84098 / US | 06 /
Mellon, David 832 Martingale Lane Park City UT 84098 / US | [2007/22] | Representative(s) | Braun, André jr., et al Braunpat Braun Eder AG Reussstrasse 22 Postfach 4015 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Braun, André jr., et al Braunpat Braun Eder AG Reussstrasse 22 Postfach 4015 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2007/22] | Braun, André jr., et al Braunpat Braun Eder AG Reussstrasse 22 4054 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 06023113.1 | 07.11.2006 | [2007/22] | Priority number, date | US20050287692 | 28.11.2005 Original published format: US 287692 | [2007/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1790386 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1790386 | Date: | 26.12.2007 | [2007/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A62B37/00, A62B33/00, A63B29/02, A45F3/04, // A45C15/00 | [2007/52] | CPC: |
A45F3/04 (EP,US);
A62B25/00 (EP,US);
A62B33/00 (EP,US);
A45C15/00 (EP,US);
A45F2003/001 (EP,US);
A63B29/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/22] | A62B37/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/22] | Title | German: | Verbessertes Tragesystem mit Atemschutzgerät | [2007/22] | English: | Improved carrying system with breathing apparatus | [2007/22] | French: | Système de transport amelioré avec respirateur | [2007/22] | Examination procedure | 26.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/33] | 28.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/45] | 29.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.07.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2014 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2326850 (HOHENESTER JOSEF) [X] 1-4 * page 4, lines 3-5 * * page 5, lines 14-19 * * page 7, line 25 * * page 8, lines 1-8 ** figures 1-4 *; | [X]DE9314670U (ROSSIGNOL SA [FR]) [X] 1-4 * figures 1,2,4,8 * * page 1, line 24 * * page 4, line 35 - page 5, line 2 * |