|
29.05.2015 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.2015 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.2015 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2015 |
English translation of the claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2015 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.03.2015 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.02.2015 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2015 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.02.2015 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.02.2015 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.02.2015 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
02.02.2015 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2015 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.01.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.01.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.01.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.12.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.2014 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
23 |
|
23.12.2014 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.2014 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.11.2014 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.11.2014 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.11.2014 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
9 |
|
03.11.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.10.2014 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.10.2014 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.10.2014 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.09.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.09.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.09.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.09.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
22.09.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.09.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.09.2014 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.09.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.09.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
11.09.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.09.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
13.05.2014 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.2014 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.05.2014 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.04.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.04.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.04.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.04.2014 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.04.2014 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.04.2014 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
11.04.2014 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.07.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.07.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.07.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
12.07.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
12.07.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
12.07.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
12.07.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
12.07.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
12.07.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
12.07.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
12.07.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
12.07.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
12.07.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
12.07.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
12.07.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
12.07.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
12.07.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.07.2013 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.03.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.2013 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
01.03.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.2013 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
17 |
|
28.02.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.02.2013 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.02.2013 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Appeal |
11 |
|
11.01.2013 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.01.2013 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.01.2013 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
3 |
|
03.09.2012 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.08.2012 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.08.2012 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
23.08.2012 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.08.2012 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
23.08.2012 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
25 |
|
03.07.2012 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.06.2012 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.06.2012 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.04.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2012 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.04.2012 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2012 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
13.04.2012 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
13.04.2012 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.04.2012 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2012 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2012 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2012 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.03.2012 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.02.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.02.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.02.2012 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.02.2012 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.02.2012 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.02.2012 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.02.2012 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.02.2012 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.02.2012 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.02.2012 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.02.2012 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.02.2012 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.02.2012 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.02.2012 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.02.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.02.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.02.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
25 |
|
22.02.2012 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.02.2012 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
22.02.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.02.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.02.2012 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
22.02.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.01.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.12.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.12.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.12.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2011 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.12.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2011 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.12.2011 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.06.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
7 |
|
14.06.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
14.06.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.06.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.06.2011 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
03.05.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2011 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.04.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.2010 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.2010 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2010 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.11.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
15.11.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.11.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
15.11.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
42 |
|
15.11.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.11.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.11.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
42 |
|
15.11.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
15.11.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
15.11.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.11.2010 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
15.11.2010 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
15.11.2010 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
15.11.2010 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
57 |
|
15.11.2010 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
15.11.2010 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
33 |
|
15.11.2010 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
46 |
|
15.11.2010 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.11.2010 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
41 |
|
15.11.2010 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
15.11.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
41 |
|
15.11.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
46 |
|
15.11.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
57 |
|
15.11.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
33 |
|
15.11.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.11.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
15.11.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
15.11.2010 |
Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
21.01.2010 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.11.2009 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.11.2009 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2009 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.10.2009 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2009 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.10.2009 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2009 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
13.01.2009 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2008 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2008 |
Information about publication, reminder payment of designation fee, response to extended European search report, if applicable |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.12.2007 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.05.2007 |
Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2007 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2007 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
20.02.2007 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2007 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2007 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.2006 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2006 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2006 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2006 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.12.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
08.12.2006 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |