|
14.08.2015 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.07.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.07.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.07.2015 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
14.07.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.07.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2015 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2015 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2015 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.04.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.04.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Appeal |
5 |
|
13.04.2015 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.04.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.04.2015 |
Notification of termination of representative's authorisation |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.04.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.04.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.04.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.04.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.03.2015 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.03.2015 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.2015 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.2015 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2015 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2015 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.01.2015 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.01.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.01.2015 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.01.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.01.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.01.2015 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
16.01.2015 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.08.2013 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.08.2013 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
08.08.2013 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.08.2013 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
33 |
|
08.08.2013 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
33 |
|
01.08.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.07.2013 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
42 |
|
02.05.2013 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.2013 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.2013 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.2013 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
24 |
|
12.03.2013 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2013 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.03.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.03.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
04.03.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
8 |
|
04.03.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.03.2013 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
04.01.2013 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.01.2013 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.12.2012 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.12.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.12.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.12.2012 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.11.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.11.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.11.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2012 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2012 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.11.2012 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
06.11.2012 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.2012 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
14.12.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2011 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.12.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
6 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
5 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
10 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
19 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
09.11.2011 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2011 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
09.11.2011 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.11.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.11.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.11.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.11.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
09.11.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.11.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
19 |
|
04.10.2011 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2011 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.08.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.2011 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.2011 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.08.2011 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
04.08.2011 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2011 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.08.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.06.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2011 |
Correction to published European patent application/patent specification |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2011 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.01.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2011 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.01.2011 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2010 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2010 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2010 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2010 |
Brief communication to third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2010 |
Brief communication to third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2010 |
Brief communication to third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2010 |
Brief communication to third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2010 |
Communication from the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.08.2010 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.08.2010 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.08.2010 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.08.2010 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.03.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2010 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2010 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2010 |
Approval of request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2010 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2010 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.02.2010 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.01.2010 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.01.2010 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2009 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
23.12.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.2009 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.12.2009 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.12.2009 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.2009 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.10.2009 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (translations of claims/payment missing) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.2009 |
Communication from the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.09.2009 |
Refusal of request for extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2009 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.09.2009 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.09.2009 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.04.2009 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.04.2009 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.04.2009 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2009 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
04.02.2009 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
31.07.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
31.07.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.06.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2007 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.05.2007 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.04.2007 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2007 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.04.2007 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.01.2007 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2007 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
09.01.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2006 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
21.12.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
21.12.2006 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.12.2006 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.12.2006 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
7 |