|
09.01.2017 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.12.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.2016 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
31 |
|
23.12.2016 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.2016 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.2016 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.09.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.09.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.09.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.09.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.09.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.09.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.09.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.09.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.09.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.09.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.09.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.09.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.09.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.09.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.09.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.09.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
17.08.2016 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
13 |
|
19.05.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.05.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.2016 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.05.2016 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.02.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.12.2013 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.12.2013 |
F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.11.2012 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.2012 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.05.2012 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.03.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.03.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.03.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.03.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.03.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.03.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.03.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.03.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.03.2012 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
24.01.2012 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.11.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.11.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2011 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.11.2011 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
18.11.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
18.11.2011 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2011 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.11.2011 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
18.11.2011 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.11.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2011 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
04.11.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2011 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2011 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2011 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2011 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.09.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.09.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.09.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.09.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.09.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.09.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.09.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.09.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.07.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.07.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
05.07.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2011 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.09.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.09.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.09.2010 |
Final instructions (loss of partial rights) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2010 |
Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.10.2009 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.09.2009 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2009 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
11.09.2009 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.04.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2006 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.01.2006 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2006 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
10.01.2006 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2006 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.01.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
10.01.2006 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2006 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2006 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.01.2006 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |