EP1705357 - Method and a relative device for diagnosing misfire or partial combustion conditions in an internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 20.04.2011 [2011/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics Srl Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/39] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Taglialatela-Scafati, Ferdinando Via 4 Giornate, 27 80014 Giugliano / IT | 02 /
Cesario, Nicola Via Plinio, 22, Parco Sereno 80013 Casalnuovo di Napoli / IT | 03 /
Di Lorenzo, Giovanni Via Salerno, 10 81100 Caserta / IT | [2006/39] | Representative(s) | Pellegri, Alberto, et al Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Via Carducci, 8 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/39] | Pellegri, Alberto, et al c/o Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Piazza Repubblica, 5 21100 Varese / IT | Application number, filing date | 06110565.6 | 01.03.2006 | [2006/39] | Priority number, date | EP20050425121 | 04.03.2005 Original published format: EP 05425121 | [2006/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1705357 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1705357 | Date: | 21.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/22 | [2006/39] | CPC: |
F02D41/2454 (EP,US);
F02D35/023 (EP,US);
F02D41/1401 (EP,US);
F02D41/1405 (EP,US);
F02D41/1458 (EP,US);
G06F18/23213 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/22] |
Former [2006/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und zugehörige Vorrichtung zur Diagnose von Fehlzündungen oder Zuständen mit partieller Verbrennung in einer Brennkraftmaschine | [2006/39] | English: | Method and a relative device for diagnosing misfire or partial combustion conditions in an internal combustion engine | [2006/39] | French: | Procédé et dispositif correspondant de diagnostic des ratés d'allumage ou conditions de combustion partielle dans un moteur à combustion interne | [2006/39] | Examination procedure | 15.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/17] | 28.03.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.07.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 11.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.05.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2007 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 21.01.2009 | [2011/16] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS6230932 ; | [X]US5093792 (TAKI MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1* column 5, line 35 - line 48 *; | [X]US5878717 (ZUR LOYE AXEL OTTO [US]) [X] 1,2,5,6,8 * column 8, line 42 - column 9, line 23 *; | [X]US2003010101 (ZUR LOYE AXEL O [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0056] *; | [X]EP1375890 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0026] * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870707), vol. 011, no. 208, Database accession no. (P - 593), & JP62030932 A 19870209 (MAZDA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1,2 * abstract * |