EP1750015 - Shroud and rotary vane wheel of propeller fan and propeller fan [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.10.2019 [2019/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 16-5, Konan 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | [2007/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Atsushi Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 3-1, Asahi Nishi-biwajima-cho Kiyosu, Aichi 452-8561 / JP | 02 /
Tominaga, Tetsuo Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. Takasago R&D Center 1-1, Arai-cho Shinhama 2-chome Takasago, Hyogo 676-8686 / JP | 03 /
Eguchi, Tsuyoshi Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. Takasago R&D Center 1-1, Arai-cho Shinhama 2-chome Takasago, Hyogo 676-8686 / JP | 04 /
Kamiya, Kazuyuki Churyo Engineering Co., Ltd. 60-1 Kutanjo Iwatsuka-cho Nakamura-ku Nagoya, Aichi 453-0862 / JP | 05 /
Soya, Asuka Churyo Engineering Co., Ltd. 60-1 Kutanjo Iwatsuka-cho Nakamura-ku Nagoya, Aichi 453-0862 / JP | [2018/46] |
Former [2007/06] | 01 /
Suzuki, Atsushi Mitsubishi Heavy Ind. Ltd. 3-1, Asahi Nishi-biwajima-cho Kiyosu, Aichi 452-8561 / JP | ||
02 /
Tominaga, Tetsuo Mitsubishi Heavy Ind. Ltd. Takasago R&D Center 1-1, Arai-cho Shinhama 2-chome Takasago, Hyogo 676-8686 / JP | |||
03 /
Eguchi, Tsuyoshi Mitsubishi Heavy Ind. Ltd. Takasago R&D Center 1-1, Arai-cho Shinhama 2-chome Takasago, Hyogo 676-8686 / JP | |||
04 /
Kamiya, Kazuyuki CHURYO ENGINEERING CO., LTD. 60-1 Kutanjo Iwatsuka-cho Nakamura-ku Nagoya, Aichi 453-0862 / JP | |||
05 /
Soya, Asuka CHURYO ENGINEERING CO., LTD. 60-1 Kutanjo Iwatsuka-cho Nakamura-ku Nagoya, Aichi 453-0862 / JP | Representative(s) | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158 rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2018/46] |
Former [2007/06] | Intes, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie, 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 06110599.5 | 02.03.2006 | [2007/06] | Priority number, date | JP20050225856 | 03.08.2005 Original published format: JP 2005225856 | JP20050225858 | 03.08.2005 Original published format: JP 2005225858 | JP20050225859 | 03.08.2005 Original published format: JP 2005225859 | [2007/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1750015 | Date: | 07.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1750015 | Date: | 05.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1750015 | Date: | 14.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/52, F04D29/66, F04D29/32, F04D19/00, F04D29/54, F04D29/38, F01D5/14 | [2018/22] | CPC: |
F04D29/667 (EP,US);
F04D29/328 (EP,US);
F04D29/384 (EP,US);
F04D29/386 (EP,US);
F04D29/544 (EP,US);
F01D5/14 (EP,US);
F05D2240/304 (EP,US);
F05D2250/183 (EP,US);
F05D2260/96 (EP,US);
Y10S416/02 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/27] | F04D29/52, F04D29/66, F04D29/32, F04D19/00, F04D29/54, F04D29/38 | ||
Former IPC [2007/06] | F04D29/52, F04D29/66, F04D29/32 | Designated contracting states | DE [2018/07] |
Former [2007/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Gehäuse und Flügelzellenrad eines Propellerlüfters und Propellerlüfter | [2007/06] | English: | Shroud and rotary vane wheel of propeller fan and propeller fan | [2007/06] | French: | Virole et roue à palettes rotatif de ventilateur à hélice et ventilateur à hélice | [2007/06] | Examination procedure | 02.03.2006 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/07] | 06.01.2018 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 01.03.2018 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 08.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 03.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17178024.0 / EP3267043 | EP17178028.1 / EP3267044 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.06.2018 | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS63295899 (MARUYAMA MFG CO) [Y] 2 * abstract *; | [A]EP0387987 (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [A] 1,3 * column 3, line 5 - line 47; figure 1 * * column 4, line 13 - line 32; figure 5 *; | [X]US4959571 (YASUMOTO KAZUHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,3 * column 2, line 41 - column 3, line 13; figures 1,4 *; | [XY]US2003091435 (HORNG ALEX [TW], et al) [X] 1,3 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0017]; figures 4-6 * [Y] 2; | [A]JP2004278370 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1,3* abstract *; | [X]US2005106026 (OOSAWA HONAMI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0033]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0038]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0045]; figure 5 * | by applicant | JPH07167095 | JP2002047937 | JP2004218513 | JP2005225858 | JP2005225859 |