EP1837994 - Wideband frequency discriminator and radiolocalization receiver [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.2010 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2009/31] |
Former [2007/39] | For all designated states Nemerix SA Via Pobiette 11 6928 Mamo / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brenner, Joel Via Luigi Giudici 6864 Arzo / CH | [2007/39] | Representative(s) | P&TS SA (AG, Ltd.) Avenue J.-J. Rousseau 4 P.O. Box 2848 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [N/P] | P&TS Patents & Technology Surveys SA Case Postale 2848 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | ||
Former [2007/39] | P&TS Patents & Technology Surveys SA Rue des Terreaux 7, Postfach 2848 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | Application number, filing date | 06111566.3 | 22.03.2006 | [2007/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1837994 | Date: | 26.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1837994 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H03L7/085, H03D13/00, G01S1/00 | [2007/39] | CPC: |
H03D3/006 (EP,US);
G01S19/36 (EP,US);
H03D13/00 (EP,US);
H03L7/085 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/39] | Title | German: | Breitband Frequenzdiskriminator und Funkortungsempfänger | [2007/39] | English: | Wideband frequency discriminator and radiolocalization receiver | [2007/39] | French: | Dispositif discriminateur de fréquence à large bande et récepteur de radiolocalisation | [2007/39] | Examination procedure | 04.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/16] | 04.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 06.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.12.2009 | BE | 02.12.2009 | CY | 02.12.2009 | CZ | 02.12.2009 | DK | 02.12.2009 | EE | 02.12.2009 | FI | 02.12.2009 | IT | 02.12.2009 | LT | 02.12.2009 | LV | 02.12.2009 | NL | 02.12.2009 | PL | 02.12.2009 | RO | 02.12.2009 | SE | 02.12.2009 | SI | 02.12.2009 | SK | 02.12.2009 | TR | 02.12.2009 | BG | 02.03.2010 | GR | 03.03.2010 | ES | 13.03.2010 | IE | 22.03.2010 | LU | 22.03.2010 | CH | 31.03.2010 | LI | 31.03.2010 | MC | 31.03.2010 | IS | 02.04.2010 | PT | 02.04.2010 | HU | 03.06.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
BE | 02.12.2009 | ||
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2009 | ||
DK | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
IT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LV | 02.12.2009 | ||
NL | 02.12.2009 | ||
PL | 02.12.2009 | ||
RO | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SK | 02.12.2009 | ||
BG | 02.03.2010 | ||
GR | 03.03.2010 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
IE | 22.03.2010 | ||
LU | 22.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
IS | 02.04.2010 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
HU | 03.06.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
BE | 02.12.2009 | ||
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2009 | ||
DK | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
IT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LV | 02.12.2009 | ||
NL | 02.12.2009 | ||
PL | 02.12.2009 | ||
RO | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SK | 02.12.2009 | ||
BG | 02.03.2010 | ||
GR | 03.03.2010 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
IE | 22.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
IS | 02.04.2010 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
HU | 03.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
BE | 02.12.2009 | ||
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2009 | ||
DK | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
IT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LV | 02.12.2009 | ||
NL | 02.12.2009 | ||
PL | 02.12.2009 | ||
RO | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SK | 02.12.2009 | ||
BG | 02.03.2010 | ||
GR | 03.03.2010 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
IE | 22.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
IS | 02.04.2010 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/12] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
BE | 02.12.2009 | ||
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2009 | ||
DK | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
LT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LV | 02.12.2009 | ||
NL | 02.12.2009 | ||
PL | 02.12.2009 | ||
RO | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SK | 02.12.2009 | ||
BG | 02.03.2010 | ||
GR | 03.03.2010 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
IE | 22.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
IS | 02.04.2010 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
BE | 02.12.2009 | ||
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2009 | ||
DK | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
LT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LV | 02.12.2009 | ||
NL | 02.12.2009 | ||
PL | 02.12.2009 | ||
RO | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SK | 02.12.2009 | ||
BG | 02.03.2010 | ||
GR | 03.03.2010 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
IE | 22.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
IS | 02.04.2010 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
BE | 02.12.2009 | ||
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
LT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LV | 02.12.2009 | ||
NL | 02.12.2009 | ||
PL | 02.12.2009 | ||
RO | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SK | 02.12.2009 | ||
BG | 02.03.2010 | ||
GR | 03.03.2010 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
IS | 02.04.2010 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/41] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
BE | 02.12.2009 | ||
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
LT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LV | 02.12.2009 | ||
NL | 02.12.2009 | ||
PL | 02.12.2009 | ||
RO | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SK | 02.12.2009 | ||
BG | 02.03.2010 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
IS | 02.04.2010 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
LT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LV | 02.12.2009 | ||
PL | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
LT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LV | 02.12.2009 | ||
PL | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 02.12.2009 | |
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
LT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LV | 02.12.2009 | ||
PL | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5291081 (TAKEUCHI YOSHIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 1, line 43 - column 2, line 24 * * column 3, line 22 - column 7, line 10 *; | [A]EP0788225 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * column 10, line 28 - column 11, line 15 *; | [A]WO0225829 (EAGLE EYE INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0008] ** paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0056] * |