EP1715542 - Polymer electrolyte for a lithium secondary battery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 575 Shin-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/43] | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 575 Shin-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Yong-Beom Legal & IP Team, Samsung SDI Co., LTD., 428-5 Gongsae-dong, Kiheung-gu, Yongin-si, Kyunggi-do / KR | 02 /
Cheong, Kwang-Jo Legal & IP Team, Samsung SDI Co.LTD. 428-5 Gongsae-dong, Kiheung-gu Yongin-si, Kyunggi-do / KR | 03 /
Song, Eui-Hwan Legal & IP Team Samsung SDI Co.Ltd. 428-5, Gongsae-dong,Kiheung-gu Gongsae-dong, Kiheung-gu Yongin-si, Kyunggi-do / KR | [2008/27] |
Former [2006/43] | 01 /
Lee, Yong-Beom Legal & IP Team, Samsung SDI Co., LTD., 428-5, Go Kyunggi-do / KR | ||
02 /
Cheong, Kwang-Jo Samsung SDI Co.LTD. 428-5, Gongsae-dong,Kiheung-gu Yongin-si, Kyunggi-do / KR | |||
03 /
Song, Eui-Hwan Samsung SDI Co.Ltd. 428-5, Gongsae-dong,Kiheung-gu Yongin-si, Kyunggi-do / KR | Representative(s) | Hengelhaupt, Jürgen, et al Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | Hengelhaupt, Jürgen, et al Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2006/43] | Hengelhaupt, Jürgen, et al Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Scheider Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 06112896.3 | 21.04.2006 | [2006/43] | Priority number, date | KR20050033084 | 21.04.2005 Original published format: KR 2005033084 | [2006/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1715542 | Date: | 25.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1715542 | Date: | 10.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/40, H01M6/22 | [2006/43] | CPC: |
H01M10/0565 (EP,US);
H01M4/02 (KR);
C08G63/21 (EP,US);
C08G63/91 (EP,US);
H01M10/05 (KR);
H01M10/0525 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0082 (EP,US);
H01M4/131 (EP,US);
H01M4/133 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB [2007/27] |
Former [2006/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Polymerelektrolyt für sekundäre Lithiumbatterien | [2006/43] | English: | Polymer electrolyte for a lithium secondary battery | [2006/43] | French: | Électrolyte polymère pour une batterie secondaire au lithium | [2006/43] | Examination procedure | 21.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/43] | 23.11.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 21.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/34] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 21.05.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 21.05.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.06.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1347462 (NIPPON KAYAKU KK [JP]) [X] 1-8,11,15-26 * paragraphs [0006] , [0007] , [0022] , [0038] , [0040] *; | [X]EP1508934 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,4,6,8-26 * paragraphs [0002] , [0015] , [0016] , [0019] , [0020] , [0023] , [2427] - [0030] *; | [A]EP1524709 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-26* the whole document * |