EP1717140 - Tricycle push handle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.03.2010 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.04.2010 [2010/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RADIO FLYER INC. 6515 West Grand Avenue Chicago, IL 60707 / US | [2006/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Michelau, Frederick 616 Marshall Des Plaines, IL 60016 / US | 02 /
Schlegel, Thomas 123 Hawkins Circle Wheaton, IL 60187 / US | [2006/44] | Representative(s) | Tetaz, Franck Claude Edouard, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 139, rue Vendôme 69477 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/44] | Tetaz, Franck Claude Edouard, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 129, rue Servient 69326 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | Application number, filing date | 06113098.5 | 25.04.2006 | [2006/44] | Priority number, date | US20050113588 | 25.04.2005 Original published format: US 113588 | [2006/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1717140 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/44] | Classification | IPC: | B62K9/02, B62H7/00 | [2006/44] | CPC: |
B62H7/00 (EP,US);
B62K9/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Griffstange für ein Dreirad | [2006/44] | English: | Tricycle push handle | [2006/44] | French: | Tige de guidage pour tricycle | [2006/44] | Examination procedure | 03.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/17] | 08.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | US5338204 | US5531494 | US6149178 | US5303944 | US6161847 | US6663115 |