EP1705782 - Motor for a power tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.02.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Black & Decker, Inc. 1207 Drummond Plaza Newark, DE 19711 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/16] | For all designated states Black & Decker, Inc. 1207 Drummond Plaza Newark, DE 19711 / US | ||
Former [2006/39] | For all designated states Black & Decker, Inc. 1207 Drummond Plaza Newark Newark, DE 19711 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ortt, Earl M 103 Crafton Road Bel Air, Ma 21014 / US | 02 /
Verbrugge, Brandon 109 Willow Avenue Towson, Ma 21286 / US | 03 /
Du, Hung T 5 Rolling Acre Way Reisterstown, Ma 21136 / US | 04 /
Davies, Morris 59 Lee Street Stewartstown, Pe 17363 / US | [2006/39] | Representative(s) | Bell, Ian Stephen, et al Black & Decker Patent Department 210 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Bell, Ian Stephen, et al Black & Decker Patent Department 210 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB | ||
Former [2006/39] | Bell, Ian Stephen, et al Black & Decker, Patent Department 210 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB | Application number, filing date | 06114179.2 | 13.06.2002 | [2006/39] | Priority number, date | US20010298261P | 14.06.2001 Original published format: US 298261 P | US20020170996 | 12.06.2002 Original published format: US 170996 | [2006/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1705782 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1705782 | Date: | 11.07.2007 | [2007/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1705782 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H02K15/14, H02K5/15, H02K5/173, H02K1/17, H02K9/06, H02K15/12, H02K15/02 | [2007/13] | CPC: |
H02K1/17 (EP);
H02K1/28 (EP);
H02K15/12 (EP);
H02K23/04 (EP);
H02K5/15 (EP);
H02K5/1732 (EP);
H02K9/06 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/39] | H02K15/14, H02K5/15, H02K5/173, H02K1/17, H02K9/06, H02K15/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2006/39] | Title | German: | Motor für ein Elektrowerkzeug | [2006/39] | English: | Motor for a power tool | [2006/39] | French: | Moteur pour outil électrique | [2006/39] | Examination procedure | 18.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/39] | 30.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02734797.0 / EP1406740 | Divisional application(s) | EP08100467.3 / EP1912315 | Opposition(s) | 18.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.04.2009 | BE | 15.04.2009 | CY | 15.04.2009 | DK | 15.04.2009 | FI | 15.04.2009 | NL | 15.04.2009 | TR | 15.04.2009 | IE | 13.06.2009 | LU | 13.06.2009 | CH | 30.06.2009 | FR | 30.06.2009 | LI | 30.06.2009 | MC | 30.06.2009 | GR | 16.07.2009 | ES | 26.07.2009 | PT | 15.09.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/22] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
BE | 15.04.2009 | ||
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
IE | 13.06.2009 | ||
LU | 13.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
FR | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
GR | 16.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
BE | 15.04.2009 | ||
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
IE | 13.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
FR | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
GR | 16.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
BE | 15.04.2009 | ||
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
IE | 13.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
FR | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
GR | 16.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
BE | 15.04.2009 | ||
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
IE | 13.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
FR | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/13] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
BE | 15.04.2009 | ||
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/02] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4377762 (TATSUMI HIDEO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 6, line 60 - column 7, line 5; figure 14 * [Y] 3,15-20; | [X]FR709084 (BECKER KURT) [X] 1,2 * page 2, line 30 - line 41; figures 2,4,5 *; | [X]US5907208 (KRISTEN FERDINAND [DE], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 23; figure 1 *; | [Y]GB2003674 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 3,15-20 * page 1, line 30 - line 41; figure 1 *; | [Y]US4793054 (ABBRATOZZATO SALVATORE R [US], et al) [Y] 15-20 * column 8, line 32 - column 10, line 29; figures 14-18 * | by applicant | US4377762 | FR709084 | US5907208 | GB2003674 | US4793054 |